EP3233491 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLASTIC VEHICLE ATTACHMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/43] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLASTIC VEHICLE PART | ||
[2018/47] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENYAHIA, Rym Am Hohengeren 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
FOURNIER, Nicolas Mont de Lans Village 38860 Les 2 Alpes / FR | 03 /
WEISSENBERGER, Uwe Griesäckerstraße 30 97078 Würzburg / DE | 04 /
ACQUARONE, Matias Duisburger Straße 37 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Gebauer, Dieter Edmund Splanemann Patentanwälte mbB Rumfordstraße 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Gebauer, Dieter Edmund Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstraße 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15777975.2 | 14.10.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015EP73738 | Priority number, date | EP20140198782 | 18.12.2014 Original published format: EP 14198782 | [2017/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016096184 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3233491 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3233491 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B32B37/00, B32B27/00, B60R13/02, B32B37/02, B44C1/16 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
B32B37/02 (EP,EA,KR,US);
B32B37/025 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,EA,US);
B32B27/00 (EP,EA,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,EA,US);
B32B27/302 (EP,EA,US);
B32B27/308 (EP,EA,KR,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,EA,KR,US);
B32B27/365 (EP,EA,US);
B32B37/12 (EA,US);
B44C1/16 (EA,KR);
B44C1/1729 (EP,EA,US);
B60Q1/00 (EA,US);
C09D133/08 (EA,KR);
C09D175/04 (EA,KR);
C09D183/04 (EA,KR);
C09J133/00 (EA,KR);
B32B2255/10 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2255/20 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2255/205 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2255/28 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2274/00 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2307/4023 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2307/4026 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2307/41 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2307/732 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2307/75 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2309/02 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B32B2309/105 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B2309/12 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B2451/00 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2605/00 (CN,EA);
B32B2605/003 (EP,EA,KR,US);
B32B2605/006 (EP,EA,US);
B32B2605/08 (EP,EA,US);
B60J1/00 (EA,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KUNSTSTOFF-FAHRZEUGANBAUTEILS | [2017/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLASTIC VEHICLE ATTACHMENT | [2018/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT DE VÉHICULE EN MATIÈRE SYNTHÉTIQUE | [2018/47] |
Former [2017/43] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLASTIC VEHICLE PART | ||
Former [2017/43] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PIÈCE RAPPORTÉE DE VÉHICULE EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 23.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.2020
25.02.2020
ADMISSIBLE Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative Zinsinger, Norbert Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Merianstraße 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.2020
25.02.2020
ADMISSIBLE Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative Zinsinger, Norbert Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | 10.03.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.07.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.03.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.03.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 30.05.2022 | Appeal received No. T1353/22 | 30.05.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 05.08.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2015 | AL | 22.05.2019 | CY | 22.05.2019 | DK | 22.05.2019 | EE | 22.05.2019 | FI | 22.05.2019 | HR | 22.05.2019 | LT | 22.05.2019 | LV | 22.05.2019 | MC | 22.05.2019 | MK | 22.05.2019 | MT | 22.05.2019 | RS | 22.05.2019 | SI | 22.05.2019 | SM | 22.05.2019 | BG | 22.08.2019 | NO | 22.08.2019 | GR | 23.08.2019 | IS | 22.09.2019 | IE | 14.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | AT | 14.10.2020 | CZ | 14.10.2022 | IT | 14.10.2022 | LU | 14.10.2022 | PL | 14.10.2022 | RO | 14.10.2022 | SK | 14.10.2022 | TR | 14.10.2022 | ES | 15.10.2022 | SE | 15.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | NL | 01.11.2022 | PT | 14.04.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/09] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MK | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2022 | ||
IT | 14.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.10.2022 | ||
PL | 14.10.2022 | ||
RO | 14.10.2022 | ||
SK | 14.10.2022 | ||
ES | 15.10.2022 | ||
SE | 15.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
NL | 01.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MK | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2022 | ||
IT | 14.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.10.2022 | ||
PL | 14.10.2022 | ||
RO | 14.10.2022 | ||
SK | 14.10.2022 | ||
SE | 15.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
NL | 01.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MK | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2022 | ||
IT | 14.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.10.2022 | ||
RO | 14.10.2022 | ||
SK | 14.10.2022 | ||
SE | 15.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
NL | 01.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/42] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MK | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.10.2022 | ||
RO | 14.10.2022 | ||
SK | 14.10.2022 | ||
SE | 15.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
NL | 01.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MK | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.10.2022 | ||
RO | 14.10.2022 | ||
SK | 14.10.2022 | ||
SE | 15.10.2022 | ||
NL | 01.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MK | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.10.2022 | ||
RO | 14.10.2022 | ||
SE | 15.10.2022 | ||
NL | 01.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MK | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.10.2022 | ||
RO | 14.10.2022 | ||
NL | 01.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MK | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MK | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2022 | ||
Former [2022/31] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MK | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 22.05.2019 | |
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007081915 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US], et al); | [A]FR2971969 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]); | [X]EP2689929 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | WO2013050208 |