Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3194336
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.10.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
28.06.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.11.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.04.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.04.2018 |
First examination report |
|
17.11.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
17.11.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
31.10.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] |
23.06.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
23.06.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] |
21.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
28.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|