|
27.01.2021 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2020 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
23.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.09.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.09.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings and communication from Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
17.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.02.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |