EP3192164 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRICAL ASYNCHRONOUS MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALOUM, Abdelmalek 8 allée du Président Kennedy 94550 Chevilly-Larue / FR | [2017/29] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 15778360.6 | 08.09.2015 | [2017/29] | WO2015FR52385 | Priority number, date | FR20140058382 | 08.09.2014 Original published format: FR 1458382 | [2017/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016038296 | Date: | 17.03.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3192164 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02P21/00 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
H02P21/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ELEKTRISCHEN ASYNCHRONMASCHINE | [2017/29] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRICAL ASYNCHRONOUS MACHINE | [2017/29] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE ASYNCHRONE | [2017/29] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 28.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/16] | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0047893 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US4926105 (MISCHENKO VLADISLAV A [SU], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 32, line 46 - column 56, line 62; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0461511 (KONE ELEVATOR GMBH [CH], et al) [AD] 1-7* the whole document *; | [AD]EP0617505 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9731798 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0840441 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19648534 (INNOTAS GMBH ANTRIEBS UND SICH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0884835 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2779017 (INST NAT POLYTECH GRENOBLE [FR]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2800935 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003015988 (GIUSEPPE GUIDI [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US2012001587 (KONO MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2012172237 (RENAULT SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |