Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10501075 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2019 | B2 | US2018043885 | 15.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014212686 | 17.10.2014 | WO2015JP04809 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106794828B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2019 | B | CN106794828 | 31.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014212686 | 17.10.2014 | WO2015JP04809 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3206922 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2018 | B1 | EP3206922 | 23.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014212686 | 17.10.2014 | WO2015JP04809 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016059753 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014212686 | 17.10.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6086107B | Global Dossier | 01.03.2017 | B2 | JP2016078677 | 16.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014212686 | 17.10.2014 |