Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017045235 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015RU00104 | 19.02.2015 | RU2014118847 | 12.05.2014 | RU2014114724 | 15.04.2014 | RU2014124528 | 17.06.2014 | RU2014114719 | 15.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3133351 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2021 | B1 | EP3133351 | 21.06.2017 | A4 | EP3133351 | 22.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015RU00104 | 19.02.2015 | RU2014118847 | 12.05.2014 | RU2014114724 | 15.04.2014 | RU2014124528 | 17.06.2014 | RU2014114719 | 15.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2014114719 | 20.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | RU2014114719 | 15.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2570306 | 10.12.2015 | C2 | RU2014114724 | 27.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | RU2014114724 | 15.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2568097 | 10.11.2015 | C1 | Priority number | Date | RU2014124528 | 17.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2568177 | 10.11.2015 | C1 | Priority number | Date | RU2014118847 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015160279 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | RU2014118847 | 12.05.2014 | RU2014114724 | 15.04.2014 | RU2014124528 | 17.06.2014 | RU2014114719 | 15.04.2014 |