EP3133497 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2017/08] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Tetsunori c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/08] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/08] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 15779836.4 | 24.02.2015 | [2017/08] | WO2015JP55285 | Priority number, date | JP20140082674 | 14.04.2014 Original published format: JP 2014082674 | [2017/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015159588 | Date: | 22.10.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3133497 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/00, H04N5/232, H04W8/20, H04W84/12, G06F13/40, H04M1/725, H04W76/02, // H04W76/04, H04W84/20 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
G06F13/4022 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04N23/661 (EP,US);
H04N23/667 (EP,US);
H04W8/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/08] | G06F13/00, H04M1/00, H04N5/232, H04W8/20, H04W84/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2017/08] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2017/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, ET PROGRAMME | [2017/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2016 | Translation filed | 07.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 23.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 22.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008311852 (HANSEN CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [Y] 2-10,12 * figure 4 ** paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0091] *; | [XYI]US2014028435 (BROCKWAY III RICHARD T [US], et al) [X] 1,11,13,14 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0060] * [Y] 2-10,12 [I] 15 | International search | [A]JP2011045026 (YAMAHA CORP) [A] 1-17* , fig. 5, 6 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2012156726 (SONY CORP) [Y] 3-5 * , paragraphs [0062], [0075], [0076] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013085050 (HITACHI CONSUMER ELECTRONICS) [Y] 1-17 * , paragraphs [0003], [0026] to [0043]; fig. 3 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013223193 (NTT DOCOMO INC) [Y] 10 * , paragraphs [0038] to [0043]; fig. 5 & WO 2013/157541 A1 & CN 104221468 A *; | [Y]JP2014010608 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-17 * , paragraphs [0015] to [0055]; fig. 1, 3, 8 & US 2014/0004896 A1 & CN 103533667 A * |