EP3201241 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A BROMINATED ELASTOMER WITH IMPROVED MOONEY VISCOSITY STABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown TX 77520-2101 / US | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALPE, Stephen, T. 56 Mayfair Gardens Southampton SO15 2TW / US | 02 /
KELCHTERMANS, Mauritz, M. Hertwinkel 7 B-3061 Leefdaal / BE | 03 /
JACOB, Sunny 1603 Rustic Oak Lane Seabrook, TX 77589 / US | 04 /
MCDONALD Jr., Michael, F. 5634 Spring Lodge Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | 05 /
CLARK, John, A. 7 Mariner Village Dr. Seabrook 77586 / US | 06 /
ROSE, Torri, L. 19719 Atascocita Pines Drive Humble, TX 77346 / US | 07 /
GU, Leming 2802 Rosebud Drive Pearland, TX 77584 / US | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 15780969.0 | 11.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015US49641 | Priority number, date | US201462057392P | 30.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462057392 P | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016053594 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3201241 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3201241 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/20, C08F210/10, C08F210/14, C08K5/00, C08L23/22, C08L23/28, B60C1/00, C08F8/22, C08F210/12, C08F236/08, C08F212/12 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
C08F8/22 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B60C1/00 (RU);
C08F210/10 (CN);
C08F210/14 (RU);
C08K5/13 (EP,RU,US);
C08K5/134 (EP,RU,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/22, C08F210/12 (CN,EP,US);
C08K5/134, C08L23/28 (US,EP);
C08K5/13, C08L23/28 (US,EP);
C08K5/3435, C08L23/28 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BROMIERTEN ELASTOMERS MIT VERBESSERTER MOONEY-VISKOSITÄTSSTABILITÄT | [2017/32] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A BROMINATED ELASTOMER WITH IMPROVED MOONEY VISCOSITY STABILITY | [2017/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN ÉLASTOMÈRE BROMÉ PRÉSENTANT UNE STABILITÉ DE VISCOSITÉ DE MOONEY AMÉLIORÉE | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 19.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2015 | AL | 23.03.2022 | AT | 23.03.2022 | CY | 23.03.2022 | CZ | 23.03.2022 | DK | 23.03.2022 | EE | 23.03.2022 | ES | 23.03.2022 | FI | 23.03.2022 | HR | 23.03.2022 | IT | 23.03.2022 | LT | 23.03.2022 | LV | 23.03.2022 | MC | 23.03.2022 | MK | 23.03.2022 | MT | 23.03.2022 | NL | 23.03.2022 | PL | 23.03.2022 | RO | 23.03.2022 | RS | 23.03.2022 | SE | 23.03.2022 | SI | 23.03.2022 | SK | 23.03.2022 | SM | 23.03.2022 | TR | 23.03.2022 | BG | 23.06.2022 | NO | 23.06.2022 | GR | 24.06.2022 | IS | 23.07.2022 | PT | 25.07.2022 | IE | 11.09.2022 | LU | 11.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | FR | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.09.2015 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
MK | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
TR | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 11.09.2022 | ||
LU | 11.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 11.09.2015 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
MK | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 11.09.2022 | ||
LU | 11.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 11.09.2015 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 11.09.2022 | ||
LU | 11.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 11.09.2015 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 11.09.2022 | ||
LU | 11.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 11.09.2022 | ||
LU | 11.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 11.09.2022 | ||
LU | 11.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 11.09.2022 | ||
LU | 11.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
LU | 11.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.03.2022 | |
NO | 23.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US5681901 (NEWMAN NEIL FREDERICK [US]); | [XA]US2010009778 (RAJAGOPALAN MURALI [US], et al); | [XA]WO2013011017 (LANXESS INT SA [CH], et al); | [XDP]WO2015130391 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US]) | by applicant | US5569723 | US5670582 | US5681901 |