EP3156358 - ELEVATOR AUTOMATIC RESCUE AND ENERGY-SAVING DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR SAME AND SUPER CAPACITOR MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forward Electronics Company Limited 16/F, Yiko Industrial Building 10 Ka Yip Street Chai Wan Hong Kong / CN | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Eric, Ka Wai c/o Forward Electronics Company Limited 16/F. YikoIndustrial Building 10 Ka Yip Street Chai Wan Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
CHAN, Eugene, Yu Ching c/o Forward Electronics Company Limited 16/F. Yiko Industrial Building 10 Ka Yip Street Chai Wan Hong Kong / CN | 03 /
XUE, Xiangdang c/o Forward Electronics Company Limited 16/F. Yiko Industrial Building 10 Ka Yip Street Chai Wan Hong Kong / CN | 04 /
CHAN, Lok Yan, Lorraine c/o Forward Electronics Company Limited 16/F. Yiko Industrial Building 10 Ka Yip Street Chai Wan Hong Kong / CN | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15781010.2 | 10.09.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015CN89365 | Priority number, date | CN201520595650U | 07.08.2015 Original published format: CN 201520595650 U | CN201510484927 | 07.08.2015 Original published format: CN201510484927 | [2017/16] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017024653 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3156358 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/02, H02J7/02 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
B66B5/027 (EP,US);
B66B1/302 (EP,US);
B66B1/308 (US);
B66B1/32 (US);
B66B1/3446 (US);
B66B5/0018 (US);
H02J7/0014 (US);
H02J9/062 (US);
H02M3/158 (US);
H02M7/537 (US);
H02P27/06 (US);
B66B2201/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE RETTUNGS- UND ENERGIESPARVORRICHTUNG FÜR AUFZUG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE SUPERKONDENSATORMODUL | [2017/16] | English: | ELEVATOR AUTOMATIC RESCUE AND ENERGY-SAVING DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR SAME AND SUPER CAPACITOR MODULE | [2017/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SECOURS ET D'ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE AUTOMATIQUE D'ASCENSEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR CE DERNIER, ET MODULE DE SUPERCONDENSATEUR | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2015 | Translation filed | 26.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2015 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 26.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 31.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2336068 (ORONA S COOP [ES]) [X] 1-7,9-16 * paragraphs [0015] , [0025]; figure 1 * [I] 8; | [A]US2014015321 (NORDIN RONALD A [US]) [A] 1-16* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2010044160 (AGIRMAN ISMAIL [US], et al) [A] 1-18* , the whole document *; | [X]CN101807821 (UNIV NANJING SCIENCE & TECH) [X] 1-18 * , description, paragraphs [0025]-[0037], and figures 1 and 4 *; | [X]CN201850017U (NANTONG WEIKE ELECTROMECHANICAL MFG CO LTD) [X] 17, 18 * , description, paragraphs [0015]-[0017], and figure 1 *; | [A]CN102211724 (SHANGHAI DESHENG MICO ELEVATOR CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN103193123 (JIN LU) [X] 1-18 * , description, paragraphs [0017]-[0019], and figure 1 *; | [A]CN103441521 (SHENZHEN ADVANCED EENERGY STORAGE MATERIALS NAT ENGINEERING RES CT CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document * |