EP3198483 - UNIFIED SEARCH ON A PERSONAL COMPUTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKENNA, Sean Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
KAZA, Akhilesh Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
CLINICK, Andrew J. Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
KHOURY, Sami Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/31] | Application number, filing date | 15781213.2 | 25.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015US52334 | Priority number, date | US201414498863 | 26.09.2014 Original published format: US201414498863 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016049516 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3198483 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
G06F16/90335 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/248 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/951 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Title | German: | EINHEITLICHE SUCHE AUF EINER PERSÖNLICHEN DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/31] | English: | UNIFIED SEARCH ON A PERSONAL COMPUTING DEVICE | [2017/31] | French: | RECHERCHE UNIFIÉE SUR UN DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 01.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US7130841 (GOEL SURENDRA [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9 * abstract * * column 5, line 10 - line 20 * * column 6, line 5 - column 7, line 59 *; | [X]WO2007115254 (VISTO CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,9 * abstract ** paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2010306191 (LEBEAU MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0066]; figure 4A * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077]; figure 6 *; | [XI]WO2011097741 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9 * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0092] * [I] 3-5,10-14; | [X]WO2012054712 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0018]; figures 1a,1b * * paragraphs [0051] , [0053]; figures 1,2,4 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058]; figure 6 * | Examination | US2012284256 |