EP3349594 - SALT SUBSTITUTE COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/30] | SALT SUBSTITUTE COMPOSITION, PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2019/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PODRAVKA d.d. A. Starcevica 32 48000 Koprivnica / HR | [2020/17] |
Former [2018/30] | For all designated states PODRAVKA d.d. A. Starcevica 32 48000 Koprivnica / HR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CEPANEC, Ivica Zagorska 28 Bunjani 10314 Kriz / HR | 02 /
RANILOVIC Jasmina Trg kralja Zvonimira 21 48000 Koprivnica / HR | 03 /
CVETKOVIC, Tanja Ulica Hrvatske drzavnosti 55 Heresin 48000 Koprivnica / HR | 04 /
VUGRINEC, Sasenka Trg kralja Tomislava 7 48000 Koprivnica / HR | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Vukmir, Mladen Vukmir and Associates Gramaca 2L 10000 Zagreb / HR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Vukmir, Mladen Gramaca 2L 10000 Zagreb / HR | ||
Former [2018/30] | Bihar, Zeljko Admoveo d.o.o. Gracanska cesta 111 10000 Zagreb / HR | Application number, filing date | 15781394.0 | 14.09.2015 | [2018/30] | WO2015HR00016 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017046620 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3349594 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3349594 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23L27/40, A23L33/165, A61P9/12 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
A23L27/40 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A23L33/165 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/16, A23V2250/16, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/1614 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Extension states | BA | 23.02.2018 | ME | 23.02.2018 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERSATZPRODUKT FÜR SALZ, UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2019/44] | English: | SALT SUBSTITUTE COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF | [2019/44] | French: | SUBSTITUT DE SEL ET SON UTILISATION | [2019/44] |
Former [2018/30] | SALZERSATZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2018/30] | SALT SUBSTITUTE COMPOSITION, PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2018/30] | COMPOSITION DE SUBSTITUT DE SEL, ET PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 23.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2019 | Observations by third parties | 03.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2015 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | GB | 14.09.2020 | IE | 14.09.2020 | LU | 14.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | FR | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 14.09.2015 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 14.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.09.2015 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 14.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 14.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 14.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 14.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 14.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [AD]BE902690 (CEDERROTH NORDIC AB) [AD] 1-13 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 4 * * example 5 * * page 9 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4985593 (WALSDORF NEILL B [US], et al) [A] 1-13* column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 39 *; | [AD]EP0417062 (BAD ISCHLER SALZ [AT]) [AD] 1-13 * page 2, lines 24-34 * * examples 1-5 *; | [AD]EP0766927 (GYARMATHY NEMES ERZSEBET DR [HU], et al) [AD] 1-13 * page 4, lines 36-47 * * page 5, lines 4-15 * * examples 1-4 *; | [A]FR2773955 (SANOFI SA [FR]) [A] 1-13 * page 1, lines 1-10 * * page 3, lines 13-15 * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 11 * * page 6, lines 6-27 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 3 * * example 1 *; | [A]US2005197402 (RUSHFORTH DENNIS S [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0010] - [0011] - [0013] *; | [A]US2009104330 (ZASYPKIN DMITRIY V [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0008] , [0024] - [0030] - [0035] - [0046] - [0055] * * table 1 * * claims 1,2 * | by applicant | GB1160191 | BE902690 | EP0380829 | EP0417062 | US5562942 | EP0766927 | EP1776875 | US2008193525 | WO2009099466 | EP2446752 | WO2015024578 | - M. P. BLAUSTEIN; F. H. LEENEN; L. CHEN; V. A. GOLOVINA; J. M. HAMLIN; T. L. PALLONE; J. W. VAN HUYSSE; J. ZHANG; G. WIER, "How NaCl raises blood pressure: a new paradigm for the pathogenesis of salt-dependent hypertension", AM. J. PHYSIOL. HEART CIRC. PHYSIOL., (2012), vol. 302, pages H1031 - 49 | other | EP3349594 | - Dr. Paul Lohmann, "Loma Salt®", Newsletter - Mareketinginformationen, no. 9, (20120700), XP055586822 | - Anonymous, "Himalaya Kristallsatz", Essential Foods, (20141108), URL: https://www.essential-foods.de, XP055586834 | - Dr. Paul Lohmann, "LomaSalt®", Dr. Paul Lohmann- Brochüre, (20111200), pages 1 - 8, XP055586839 |