EP3204898 - QUALITY MONITORING IN A PACKAGING LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA 70, Avenue Général-Guisan 1009 Pully / CH | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORUZZI, Guido Via Venezia 10 I-40068 S. Lazzaro di Savena (BO) / IT | 02 /
CORAZZARI, Gianni Via Lodovico Gavioli 2/D I-41032 Cavezzo (Modena) / IT | 03 /
TROMBINI, Davide Västra Lönnvägen 233 S-275 39 Sjöbo / SE | 04 /
GUTIÉRREZ, Marco Hugo Urb. La Zarzosa 33 39600 Muriedas / ES | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings Gata 22186 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 15781888.1 | 06.10.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015EP73037 | Priority number, date | SE20140051204 | 09.10.2014 Original published format: SE 1451204 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016055470 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3204898 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q30/00 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP);
G06Q10/06 (CN,US);
G05B19/048 (US);
G01N33/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/0081 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0639 (EP);
G06Q30/018 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q50/04 (EP);
G05B2219/23101 (US);
Y02P90/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Title | German: | QUALITÄTSÜBERWACHUNG IM EINER VERPACKUNGSLINIE | [2017/33] | English: | QUALITY MONITORING IN A PACKAGING LINE | [2017/33] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE LA QUALITÉ DANS UNE LIGNE D'EMBALLAGE | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 28.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/15] | 03.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005103984 (SENSITECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [I]US2006259182 (MANTELL DAVID A [US]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0034] *; | [I]WO2012089447 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 5, line 25 * * page 6, line 18 - page 21, line 4 * | Examination | US4307555 | US2009271243 | WO2013183635 |