EP3204388 - NOVEL 5,6-DIHYDRO-4H-BENZO[B]THIENO-[2,3-D]AZEPINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pulmocide Limited c/o Covington & Burling LLP 265 Strand London WC2R 1BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/49] | For all designated states Pulmocide Limited c/o Covington & Burling LLP 265 Strand London WC2R 1BH / GB | ||
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states Pulmocide Limited 265 Strand London WC2R 1BH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNT, Simon Fraser c/o Sygnature Discovery Ltd Biocity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | 02 /
ONIONS, Stuart Thomas c/o Sygnature Discovery Ltd Biocity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | 03 /
SHERBUKHIN, Vladimir c/o Sygnature Discovery Ltd Biocity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | 04 /
FORDYCE, Euan Alexander Fraser c/o Sygnature Discovery Ltd Biocity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | 05 /
MURRAY, Peter John Pulmocide Limited c/o Covington & Burling LLP 265 Strand London WC2R 1BH / GB | 06 /
COATES, Matthew Stephen Pulmocide Limited c/o Covington & Burling LLP 265 Strand London WC2R 1BH / GB | 07 /
BROOKES, Daniel William Pulmocide Limited c/o Covington & Burling LLP 265 Strand London WC2R 1BH / GB | 08 /
ITO, Kazuhiro Pulmocide Limited c/o Covington & Burling LLP 265 Strand London WC2R 1BH / GB | 09 /
STRONG, Peter Pulmocide Limited c/o Covington & Burling LLP 265 Strand London WC2R 1BH / GB | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15782045.7 | 08.10.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015GB52945 | Priority number, date | EP20140188494 | 10.10.2014 Original published format: EP 14188494 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016055792 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3204388 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3204388 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D495/04, A61K31/55, A61P31/14 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
C07D519/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/407 (KR);
A61K31/55 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61K9/10 (US);
A61K9/14 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 5,6-DIHYDRO-4H-BENZO[B]THIENO[2,3-D]AZEPINE DERIVATIVE | [2018/31] | English: | NOVEL 5,6-DIHYDRO-4H-BENZO[B]THIENO-[2,3-D]AZEPINE DERIVATIVES | [2017/33] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 5,6-DIHYDRO-4H-BENZO[B]THIÉNO[2,3-D]AZÉPINES | [2018/31] |
Former [2017/33] | NEUE 5,6-DIHYDRO-4 H-BENZO [B] THIENO-[ 2,3-D ] AZEPINDERIVATE | ||
Former [2017/33] | NOUVELLES 5,6-DIHYDRO-4 H-BENZO [B] THIÉNO-[ 2,3-D ] AZEPINE | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 04.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2015 | AL | 12.12.2018 | AT | 12.12.2018 | CY | 12.12.2018 | CZ | 12.12.2018 | DK | 12.12.2018 | EE | 12.12.2018 | ES | 12.12.2018 | FI | 12.12.2018 | HR | 12.12.2018 | IT | 12.12.2018 | LT | 12.12.2018 | LV | 12.12.2018 | MC | 12.12.2018 | MK | 12.12.2018 | MT | 12.12.2018 | NL | 12.12.2018 | PL | 12.12.2018 | RO | 12.12.2018 | RS | 12.12.2018 | SE | 12.12.2018 | SI | 12.12.2018 | SK | 12.12.2018 | SM | 12.12.2018 | TR | 12.12.2018 | BG | 12.03.2019 | NO | 12.03.2019 | GR | 13.03.2019 | IS | 12.04.2019 | PT | 12.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.10.2015 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
MT | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.10.2015 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 12.12.2018 | |
NO | 12.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2011005842 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 34 * example 54; claim 1; table 1; compounds L, M *[Y] 1-44; | [Y] - XIONG HUI ET AL, "Discovery of a potent respiratory syncytial virus RNA polymerase inhibitor", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20131016), vol. 23, no. 24, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2013.10.018, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 6789 - 6793, XP028788018 [Y] 1-44 * table 3; compounds 11f, 11i, 11j * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2013.10.018 |