EP3209180 - VACUUM CLEANER WITH MOTOR BETWEEN SEPARATION STAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2022/17] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOX, Charles c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 02 /
JOHNSON, Mark c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Booth, Andrew Steven Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2022/17] |
Former [2017/35] | Warner, Thomas Andrew, et al Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | Application number, filing date | 15782065.5 | 12.10.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015GB52982 | Priority number, date | GB20140018791 | 22.10.2014 Original published format: GB 201418791 | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016063008 | Date: | 28.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3209180 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3209180 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3209180 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/16, A47L9/22 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
A47L9/22 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A47L9/2889 (GB,KR,US);
A47L9/1608 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A47L9/16 (GB);
A47L5/22 (KR,US);
A47L5/28 (GB);
A47L7/04 (GB);
A47L9/1616 (CN,KR,US);
A47L9/1625 (KR);
A47L9/1633 (KR,US);
A47L9/1641 (EP,KR,US);
A47L9/28 (GB);
H02K9/06 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2017/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STAUBSAUGER MIT MOTOR ZWISCHEN DEN ABSCHEIDUNGSSTUFEN LIEGEND | [2018/22] | English: | VACUUM CLEANER WITH MOTOR BETWEEN SEPARATION STAGES | [2017/35] | French: | ASPIRATEUR AVEC MOTEUR ENTRE DES ÉTAGES DE SÉPARATION | [2018/22] |
Former [2017/35] | STAUBSAUGER MIT MOTOR ZWISCHEN TRENNUNGSSTUFEN | ||
Former [2017/35] | ASPIRATEUR DOTÉ D'UN MOTEUR ENTRE ÉTAGES DE SÉPARATION | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 19.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US Opponent's representative SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US Opponent's representative SBD IPAdmin 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | 29.05.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.10.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.06.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.09.2020 | 09.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.01.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.08.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.08.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 16.03.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2015 | AL | 15.08.2018 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | PT | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | IE | 12.10.2018 | LU | 12.10.2018 | MT | 12.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | FR | 31.10.2020 | [2021/35] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 12.10.2015 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MK | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
MT | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
MT | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
MT | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
MT | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.10.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9510972 (SJOEGREEN JOERGEN [DK]) [A] 1-11* page 6, line 20 - page 9, line 2; figure 1A *; | [XA]US2006059874 (CHO HYOUNG-JOO [KR], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-11; | [A]EP2581015 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0065]; figures 9A-9E * | Opposition | FR989553 | EP0042723 | US5815881 | US6167588 | US6341404 | JP2003125995 | EP1721652 | EP2364630 | US2011219573 | EP2581009 |