EP3200775 - COMBINATION THERAPIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Zhu, Alexander Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research Inc. 250 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
RONG, Xianhui Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research Inc. 250 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
PINZON-ORTIZ, Maria, Consuelo Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research Inc. 250 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
LONGMIRE, Tyler Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research Inc. 250 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 05 /
LEE, Benjamin, Hyun Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research Inc. 250 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2019/47] |
Former [2017/32] | Truscott, Glyn John Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15782164.6 | 02.10.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015US53799 | Priority number, date | US201462059832P | 03.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462059832 P | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016054555 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3200775 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3200775 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K31/506, C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
C07K16/2818 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K31/4045 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
A61K31/444 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K39/39541 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (CN);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/2803 (US);
C07K16/2827 (US);
C07K16/3015 (US);
C07K16/3023 (US);
C07K16/303 (US);
C07K16/3038 (US);
C07K16/3046 (US);
C07K16/3053 (US);
C07K16/3069 (US);
G01N33/574 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K39/39541, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2017/32] | A61K31/00, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | 11.04.2017 | ME | 11.04.2017 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIEN | [2017/32] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPIES | [2017/32] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIES | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 11.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19206634.8 / EP3662903 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2015 | AL | 20.11.2019 | AT | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | NL | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | RS | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | [2023/37] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 02.10.2015 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MK | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.10.2015 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5968511 (AKITA ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,22,23,25,51 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2007113648 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,22,23,25,27,51 * page 67, line 19 *; | [XI]WO2010051502 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,22,23,25,51 * page 72, line 24 - page 73, line 7 * [I] 6,10-21,24,26-30,40,41; | [A]WO2011011027 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [A] 1-51 * examples 1-7 * * paragraph [0157] *; | [XD]WO2012022814 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [XD] 1-5,8,9,22,23,25,51 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2015095423 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-5,7-12,14,22-30,34,35,49-51 * paragraph [0381] *; | [XP]WO2015095811 (BOARD INST INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-5,8-12,14,22-30,44-46,49-51 * example 10 * * paragraph [0347] *; | [XP]WO2015112900 (DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUE INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-5,8-14,18,22-30,34,35,42,43,49-51 * page 151 *; | [XP]WO2015117002 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [XP] 1-5,8-13,20-26,34,35,49-51 * pages 161,162 *; | [XP]WO2015138920 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [XP] 1-5,8-13,16,17,22-26,34,35,51 * pages 167,168 *; | [E]WO2016028672 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [E] 1-5,8-12,16,17,22-26,51 * page 135, line 22 ** page 162, line 10 *; | [L]WO2016040880 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [L] * the whole document *; | [L]WO2016040892 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [L] * the whole document *; | [XI] - YUAN Z ET AL, "Blockade of inhibitors of apoptosis (IAPs) in combination with tumor-targeted delivery of tumor necrosis factor-[alpha] leads to synergistic antitumor activity", CANCER GENE THERAPY, APPLETON & LANGE, GB, vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.1038/CGT.2012.83, ISSN 0929-1903, (20130101), pages 46 - 56, (20121116), XP008178507 [X] 1-5,7-9,20,22,23,25,51 * abstract * [I] 6,10,15-17,19,21,24,26,31-33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cgt.2012.83 | [T] - NAKAE S ET AL, "Mast cells enhance T cell activation: importance of mast cell costimulatory molecules and secreted TNF", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20060215), vol. 176, no. 4, doi:10.4049/JIMMUNOL.176.4.2238, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2238 - 2248, XP002752656 [T] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.176.4.2238 | [A] - KNIGHTS A J ET AL, "Inhibitor of apoptosis protein (IAP) antagonists demonstrate divergent immunomodulatory properties in human immune subsets with implications for combination therapy", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY AND IMMUNOTHERAPY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, vol. 62, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S00262-012-1342-1, ISSN 0340-7004, (20130201), pages 321 - 335, (20120826), XP002752661 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-012-1342-1 | [A] - R. MOREIRA DA SILVA, "Nivolumab: Anti-PD-1 monoclonal antibody cancer immunotherapy", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, ES, (20140101), vol. 39, no. 1, doi:10.1358/dof.2014.039.01.2103754, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 15 - 24, XP055199597 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2014.039.01.2103754 | [A] - MATTHEW VANNEMAN ET AL, "Combining immunotherapy and targeted therapies in cancer treatment", NATURE REVIEWS CANCER, (20120101), vol. 12, no. 4, doi:10.1038/nrc3237, ISSN 1474-175X, pages 237 - 251, XP055045378 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrc3237 | [A] - GARRISON K ET AL, "The small molecule TGF-[beta] signaling inhibitor SM16 synergizes with agonistic OX40 antibody to suppress established mammary tumors and reduce spontaneous metastasis", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY, IMMUNOTHERAPY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, vol. 61, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S00262-011-1119-Y, ISSN 1432-0851, (20120401), pages 511 - 521, (20111005), XP002752658 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-011-1119-y | [T] - ZHUANG J ET AL, "Selective IAP inhibition results in sensitization of unstimulated but not CD40-stimulated chronic lymphocytic leukaemia cells to TRAIL-induced apoptosis", PHARMACOLOGY RESEARCH & PERSPECTIVES, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, GB, vol. 2, no. 6, doi:10.1002/PRP2.81, ISSN 2052-1707, (20141201), Database accession no. E00081, pages 1 - 14, (20140901), XP002752660 [T] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/prp2.81 | [A] - JOSE LUIS PEREZ-GRACIA ET AL, "Orchestrating immune check-point blockade for cancer immunotherapy in combinations", CURRENT OPINION IN IMMUNOLOGY, (20140401), vol. 27, doi:10.1016/j.coi.2014.01.002, ISSN 0952-7915, pages 89 - 97, XP055200525 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coi.2014.01.002 | [XI] - VERBRUGGE INGE ET AL, "The curative outcome of radioimmunotherapy in a mouse breast cancer model relies on mTOR signaling", RADIATION RESEARCH, RADIATION RESEARCH SOCIETY, GB, vol. 182, no. 2, doi:10.1667/RR13511.1, ISSN 1938-5404, (20140801), pages 219 - 229, (20140624), XP002745809 [X] 1-5,7-12,22,23,25,27,51 * figure 1C * [I] 6,15,19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1667/RR13511.1 | [A] - Q. JIANG ET AL, "mTOR Kinase Inhibitor AZD8055 Enhances the Immunotherapeutic Activity of an Agonist CD40 Antibody in Cancer Treatment", CANCER RESEARCH, (20110503), vol. 71, no. 12, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-10-3968, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4074 - 4084, XP055099556 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-10-3968 | [XI] - Wang et al, "The Mdm2 inhibitor, NVP-CGM097, in combination with the BRAF inhibitor NVP-LGX818 elicits synergistic antitumor effects in melanoma", (20141001), Cancer Research, URL: http://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/74/19_Supplement/5466, (20160414), XP002756552 [X] 1-5,8,9,22,23,25,51 * the whole document * [I] 6,7,10-21,24,26-30,36,37,49,50 | [A] - Wang et al, "Abstract 2929: The Mdm2 inhibitorNVP-CGM097 enhances the anti-tumor activityof NVP-LDK378 in ALK mutant neuroblastomamodels", (20141001), Cancer Research, URL: http://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/74/19_Supplement/2929, (20160414), XP002756553 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * | [T] - JIANG X ET AL, "The activation of MAPK in melanoma cells resistant to BRAF inhibition promotes PD-L1 expression that is reversible by MEK and PI3K inhibition", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, vol. 19, no. 3, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2731, ISSN 1078-0432, (20130201), pages 598 - 609, (20121024), XP002746139 [T] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2731 | [A] - ANWESHA DEY ET AL, "Nutlin-3 inhibits the NF[kappa]B Pathway in a p53 Dependent Manner: Implications in Lung Cancer Therapy", CELL CYCLE, US, (20070901), vol. 6, no. 17, doi:10.4161/cc.6.17.4643, ISSN 1538-4101, pages 2178 - 2185, XP055203309 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/cc.6.17.4643 | [XI] - Garcia et al, "The Pan-PIM Kinase Inhibitor LGH447 Shows Activity In PIM2-Dependent Multiple Myeloma and In AML Models", (20131115), Blood, URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/122/21/1666, (20160414), XP002756554 [X] 1-5,8,9,22,25,51 * the whole document * [I] 6,7,10-13,23,24,26-30,38,39,49,50 | [A] - M PINZON-ORTIZ ET AL, "S710: THE COMBINATION OF JAK INHIBITOR RUXOLITINIB, PAN-PIM INHIBITOR LGH447, AND CDK4/6 INHIBITOR LEE011 IN A PRECLINICAL MOUSE MODEL OF MYELOPROLIFERATIVE NEOPLASIA", HAEMATOLOGICA, THE HEMATOLOGY JOURNAL : OFFICIAL ORGAN OF THE EUROPEAN HEMATOLOGY ASSOCIATION, IT, (20140601), vol. 99, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0390-6078, page 252, XP055171531 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * | [T] - CHERVONTSEVA A M ET AL, "Effect of cytarabine on expression of cell adhesion molecules and on endothelium-leukocyte interaction in vitro.", TERAPEVTICHESKII ARKHIV 2006, (2006), vol. 78, no. 7, ISSN 0040-3660, pages 67 - 72, XP008179894 [T] * abstract * | [X] - A. J. CHRISTIANSEN ET AL, "Eradication of solid tumors using histone deacetylase inhibitors combined with immune-stimulating antibodies", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20110222), vol. 108, no. 10, doi:10.1073/pnas.1011037108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4141 - 4146, XP055121803 [X] 1-5,7-9,22,23,25,51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1011037108 | [XI] - Woods et al, "Abstract 4090: Inhibition of class I histone deacetylases promotes robust and durable enhancement of PDL1 expression in melanoma: Rationale for combination therapy", (20141001), Cancer Research, URL: http://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/74/19_Supplement/4090.short, (20160414), XP002756556 [X] 1-5,8,9,22,23,25,51 * the whole document * [I] 6,10,15,19,24,26 | [A] - KIM KIBEM ET AL, "Eradication of metastatic mouse cancers resistant to immune checkpoint blockade by suppression of myeloid-derived cells. (Includes Supporting Information)", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20140812), vol. 111, no. 32, ISSN 1091-6490, pages 11774 - 7, XP002756557 [A] 1-51 * page 11776, column right - page 11777, column left * * figure 1G; table S2 * * page 11779 * * page Suppl. 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1410626111 | [T] - OKI Y ET AL, "Immune regulatory effects of panobinostat in patients with Hodgkin lymphoma through modulation of serum cytokine levels and T-cell PD1 expression.", BLOOD CANCER JOURNAL, (2014), vol. 4, ISSN 2044-5385, pages 1 - 4, XP002756558 [T] * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/bcj.2014.58 | [A] - KLEIN JAN M ET AL, "The histone deacetylase inhibitor LBH589 (panobinostat) modulates the crosstalk of lymphocytes with Hodgkin lymphoma cell lines.", PLOS ONE, (2013), vol. 8, no. 11, ISSN 1932-6203, pages 1 - 6, XP002756559 [A] 1-51 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0079502 | [A] - SONG W ET AL, "HDAC inhibition by LBH589 affects the phenotype and function of human myeloid dendritic cells.", LEUKEMIA JAN 2011, (201101), vol. 25, no. 1, ISSN 1476-5551, pages 161 - 168, XP002756560 [A] 1-51 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/leu.2010.244 | [T] - Song et al, "3681 Phenotypic and Functional Effects of Novel HDAC Inhibitor LBH589 On Human Lymphocyte Populations", (20091203), 51st ASH Annual Meeting and Exposition, URL: https://ash.confex.com/ash/2009/webprogram/Paper22684.html, (20160414), XP002756561 [T] * abstract * | [T] - WOODS DAVID M ET AL, "HDAC Inhibition Upregulates PD-1 Ligands in Melanoma and Augments Immunotherapy with PD-1 Blockade.", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY RESEARCH, (201512), vol. 3, no. 12, ISSN 2326-6074, pages 1375 - 1385, XP002756562 [T] * figure 6A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2326-6066.CIR-15-0077-T | [A] - WOODS DAVID M ET AL, "The antimelanoma activity of the histone deacetylase inhibitor panobinostat (LBH589) is mediated by direct tumor cytotoxicity and increased tumor immunogenicity.", MELANOMA RESEARCH, (201310), vol. 23, no. 5, ISSN 1473-5636, pages 341 - 348, XP002756563 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/CMR.0b013e328364c0ed | [A] - Bellucci et al, "JAK1 and JAK2 Modulate Tumor Cell Susceptibility To Natural Killer (NK) Cells Through Regulation Of PDL1 Expression", (20131115), Blood, URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/122/21/3472.full.pdf, (20160414), XP002756564 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * | [X] - QUINTARELLI CONCETTA ET AL, "Selective strong synergism of Ruxolitinib and second generation tyrosine kinase inhibitors to overcome bone marrow stroma related drug resistance in chronic myelogenous leukemia", LEUKEMIA RESEARCH, NEW YORK,NY, US, (20131115), vol. 38, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.LEUKRES.2013.11.006, ISSN 0145-2126, pages 236 - 242, XP028812560 [X] 1-5,7-9,22,24 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.leukres.2013.11.006 | [T] - CHRISTIANSSON LISA ET AL, "The tyrosine kinase inhibitors imatinib and dasatinib reduce myeloid suppressor cells and release effector lymphocyte responses.", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, (201505), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 1538-8514, pages 1181 - 1191, XP002756565 [T] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-14-0849 | [XI] - HU YI ET AL, "Essential role of AKT in tumor cells addicted to FGFR.", ANTI-CANCER DRUGS, (201402), vol. 25, no. 2, ISSN 1473-5741, pages 183 - 188, XP008179886 [X] 1-5,8,9,22,51 * the whole document * [I] 6,7,10,14,15,18,24,26-30,47-50 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/CAD.0000000000000034 | [A] - J. ACQUAVIVA ET AL, "FGFR3 Translocations in Bladder Cancer: Differential Sensitivity to HSP90 Inhibition Based on Drug Metabolism", MOLECULAR CANCER RESEARCH, (20140701), vol. 12, no. 7, doi:10.1158/1541-7786.MCR-14-0004, ISSN 1541-7786, pages 1042 - 1054, XP055182977 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1541-7786.MCR-14-0004 | [T] - MITTENDORF ELIZABETH A ET AL, "PD-L1 expression in triple-negative breast cancer.", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY RESEARCH, (201404), vol. 2, no. 4, ISSN 2326-6074, pages 361 - 370, XP002756567 [T] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2326-6066.CIR-13-0127 | [T] - GRYGIELEWICZ PAULINA ET AL, "Epithelial-mesenchymal transition confers resistance to selective FGFR inhibitors in SNU-16 gastric cancer cells", GASTRIC CANCER, SPRINGER JAPAN, TOKYO, vol. 19, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S10120-014-0444-1, ISSN 1436-3291, (20141119), pages 53 - 62, (20141119), XP035587475 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10120-014-0444-1 | by applicant | US2779780 | EP0125023 | EP0171496 | EP0173494 | WO8601533 | EP0184187 | GB2188638 | US4816567 | WO9002809 | EP0388151 | WO9100906 | WO9110741 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | WO9203918 | WO9203917 | WO9209690 | WO9215679 | WO9218619 | WO9220791 | EP0519596 | WO9301288 | US5208020 | US5223409 | US5225539 | WO9404678 | WO9410202 | US5475092 | WO9630046 | US5585089 | US5585499 | US5624821 | US5648260 | US5693761 | US5693762 | US5811097 | WO9845332 | US5846545 | WO9920758 | WO9940196 | WO9952552 | US6054297 | WO0035436 | US6111090 | WO0103720 | WO0206213 | WO0222577 | EP0666868 | WO02066470 | US6582959 | WO03064383 | WO03076424 | WO03077914 | US2003190317 | US2003203409 | US2003206899 | WO2004005281 | US6689607 | US6703020 | US2004047858 | WO2004060319 | US6780996 | WO2005007190 | WO2005012359 | US6884879 | WO2005044853 | US2005112126 | WO2005055808 | US2005186208 | WO2005113556 | WO2005115451 | WO2005121142 | US2006009360 | US7025962 | US7060269 | WO2006083289 | US7132255 | WO2006121168 | WO2006122806 | WO2007005874 | WO2007004415 | US7169791 | WO2007014011 | WO2007070514 | WO2007084786 | WO2007133822 | EP1866339 | EP1870399 | WO2008016893 | WO2008024725 | EP0920505 | WO2008073687 | WO2009036082 | EP2051990 | WO2009055730 | WO2009085983 | WO2009101611 | EP2099447 | WO2009114335 | WO2009114870 | US7598257 | US7618632 | WO2009141386 | WO2010003118 | WO2010006086 | US2010028330 | WO2010019570 | US2010056576 | WO2010027827 | WO2010026124 | WO2010029082 | WO2010036380 | US2010105667 | WO2010077634 | US7767675 | US7812135 | WO2010125571 | WO2011025927 | WO2011028683 | WO2011051726 | US7943743 | WO2011066342 | US2011150892 | WO2011076786 | EP2344474 | WO2011090754 | US8008449 | US8039479 | WO2011155607 | US2012022814 | US2012039906 | US2012114649 | WO2012079000 | EP2474545 | WO2012177624 | US8354509 | WO2013019906 | US8388967 | WO2013039954 | US8415355 | EP2581113 | WO2013054331 | WO2013079174 | WO2013082366 | EP1947183 | US8501758 | US8546336 | US8552156 | US8552002 | US8586023 | US8591886 | WO2013179174 | WO2013184757 | US8609089 | WO2014008218 | WO2014012479 | WO2014018632 | WO2014022332 | US2014044728 | US2014072566 | US8685980 | WO2014059251 | US8709424 | WO2014072493 | US8735551 | WO2014085318 | US2014271618 | WO2015026684 | - VIGLIETTA, V. ET AL., NEUROTHERAPEUTICS, (2007), vol. 4, pages 666 - 675 | - KORMAN, A. J ET AL., ADV. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 90, pages 297 - 339 | - WANG, L. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (20110307), vol. 208, no. 3, pages 577 - 92 | - LEPENIES, B ET AL., ENDOCRINE, METABOLIC & IMMUNE DISORDERS-DRUG TARGETS, (2008), vol. 8, pages 279 - 288 | - SHARPE, A. H. ET AL., NATURE REV. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 2, pages 116 - 126 | - LINDLEY, P. S. ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (2009), vol. 229, pages 307 - 321 | - DONG, C. ET AL., IMMUNOLOG. RES., (2003), vol. 28, no. 1, pages 39 - 48 | - GREENWALD, R. J. ET AL., ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 23, pages 515 - 548 | - GROSS, J. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 149, pages 380 - 388 | - LINSLEY, P. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1996), vol. 4, pages 535 - 543 | - COYLE, A. J. ET AL., NATURE IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 203 - 209 | - COLLINS, M. ET AL., GENOME BIOL., (2005), vol. 6, pages 223.1 - 223.7 | - KORMAN, A. J. ET AL., ADV. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 90, pages 297 - 339 | - OKAZAKI ET AL., CURR OPIN IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 14, pages 391779 - 82 | - BENNETT ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 170, pages 711 - 8 | - AGATA ET AL., INT IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 8, pages 765 - 72 | - FREEMAN ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2000), vol. 192, pages 1027 - 34 | - EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 32, pages 634 - 43 | - DONG ET AL., NAT. MED., (2002), vol. 8, pages 787 - 9 | - ISHIDA, Y ET AL., EMBO J., (1992), vol. 11, pages 3887 - 3895 | - BLANK, C. ET AL., IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (20061229), vol. 56, no. 5, pages 739 - 745 | - DONG ET AL., J. MOL. MED., (2003), vol. 81, pages 281 - 7 | - BLANK ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (2005), vol. 54, pages 307 - 314 | - KONISHI ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, pages 5094 - 100 | - IWAI ET AL., PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 12293 - 7 | - BROWN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 170, pages 1257 - 66 | - WANG, C. ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOLOGY RESEARCH, (2014), vol. 2, pages 846 - 856 | - FREDERICK, D.T. ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (2013), vol. 19, pages 1225 - 31 | - ALI, K. ET AL., NATURE, (2014), vol. 510, pages 407 - 411 | - HAMID, O. ET AL., NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (2013), vol. 369, no. 2, pages 134 - 44 | - SHAW ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL., (2009), vol. 27, no. 26, pages 4247 - 4253 | - SASAKI ET AL., EUR J CANCER., (2010), vol. 46, no. 10, pages 1773 - 1780 | - SHAW ET AL., N ENGL J MED., (2013), vol. 368, no. 25, pages 2385 - 2394 | - SOCINSKI ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL., (2012), vol. 30, no. 17, pages 2055 - 2062 | - YANG ET AL., J THORAC ONCOL., (2012), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 90 - 97 | - CHOI ET AL., CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 68, no. 13, pages 4971 - 6 | - HORN ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL., (2009), vol. 27, no. 26, pages 4232 - 5 | - KOIVUNEN ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 14, no. 13, pages 4275 - 83 | - SODA ET AL., NATURE, (2007), vol. 448, no. 7153, pages 561 - 6 | - TAKEUCHI ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 14, no. 20, pages 6618 - 24 | - TAKEUCHI ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (2009), vol. 15, no. 9, pages 3143 - 9 | - WONG ET AL., CANCER, (20090415), vol. 115, no. 8, pages 1723 - 33 | - RIKOVA ET AL., CELL, (2007), vol. 131, no. 6, pages 1190 - 203 | - SHINOHARA T ET AL., GENOMICS, (1994), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 704 - 6 | - FINGER LR ET AL., GENE, (1997), vol. 197, no. 1-2, pages 177 - 87 | - TRIEBEL ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1990), vol. 171, pages 1393 - 1405 | - HASTINGS ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL., (200909), vol. 39, no. 9, pages 2492 - 501 | - HINODA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, no. 18, pages 6959 - 6963 | - ZIMMERMANN W ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1987), vol. 84, no. 9, pages 2960 - 2964 | - THOMPSON J. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1989), vol. 158, no. 3, pages 996 - 1004 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 444 - 453 | - E. MEYERS; W. MILLER, CABIOS, (1989), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - CHOTHIA, C. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - "Protein Sequence and Structure Analysis of Antibody Variable Domains", Antibody Engineering Lab Manual, SPRINGER-VERLAG | - AL-LAZIKANI ET AL., JMB, (1997), vol. 273, pages 927 - 948 | - SALEH ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (1990), vol. 32, pages 180 - 190 | - LOBUGLIO ET AL., HYBRIDOMA, (1986), vol. 5, pages 5117 - 5123 | - FUCHS ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 1370 - 1372 | - HAY ET AL., HUM ANTIBOD HYBRIDOMAS, (1992), vol. 3, pages 81 - 85 | - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281 | - GRIFFTHS ET AL., EMBO J, (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734 | - HAWKINS ET AL., JMOL BIOL, (1992), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - GRAM ET AL., PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 3576 - 3580 | - GARRAD ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 1373 - 1377 | - HOOGENBOOM ET AL., NUC ACID RES, (1991), vol. 19, pages 4133 - 4137 | - BARBAS ET AL., PNAS, (1991), vol. 88, pages 7978 - 7982 | - LONBERG, N. ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 856 - 859 | - GREEN, L.L. ET AL., NATURE GENET., (1994), vol. 7, pages 13 - 21 | - MORRISON, S.L ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - BRUGGEMAN ET AL., YEAR IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 7, pages 33 - 40 | - TUAILLON ET AL., PNAS, (1993), vol. 90, pages 3720 - 3724 | - BRUGGEMAN ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL, (1991), vol. 21, pages 1323 - 1326 | - BETTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043 | - LIU ET AL., PNAS, (1987), vol. 84, pages 3439 - 3443 | - LIU ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 139, pages 3521 - 3526 | - SUN ET AL., PNAS, (1987), vol. 84, pages 214 - 218 | - NISHIMURA ET AL., CANC. RES., (1987), vol. 47, pages 999 - 1005 | - WOOD ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 446 - 449 | - SHAW ET AL., J. NATL CANCER INST., (1988), vol. 80, pages 1553 - 1559 | - MORRISON, S. L., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 1202 - 1207 | - OI ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, page 214 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 552 - 525 | - VERHOEYAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, page 1534 | - BEIDLER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 141, pages 4053 - 4060 | - COLCHER, D. ET AL., ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (1999), vol. 880, pages 263 - 80 | - REITER, Y., CLIN CANCER RES, (1996), vol. 2, pages 245 - 52 | - WOO ET AL., CANCER RES., (2012), vol. 72, no. 4, pages 917 - 27 | - MARKEL ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (20020315), vol. 168, no. 6, pages 2803 - 10 | - MARKEL ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (20061101), vol. 177, no. 9, pages 6062 - 71 | - MARKEL ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (200902), vol. 126, no. 2, pages 186 - 200 | - MARKEL ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER., (201002), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 215 - 30 | - ORTENBERG ET AL., MOL CANCER THER., (201206), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 1300 - 10 | - STERN ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (20050601), vol. 174, no. 11, pages 6692 - 701 | - ZHENG ET AL., PLOS ONE, (20100902), vol. 5, no. 9, page E12529 | - JOHN LB ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2013), vol. 19, no. 20, pages 5636 - 46 | - KEHRL, J. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1986), vol. 163, pages 1037 - 1050 | - HOWARD, M; O'GARRA, A., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1992), vol. 13, pages 198 - 200 | - HAHNE, M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 1363 - 1365 | - RIDGE, J. ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, pages 474 - 478 | - ITO, N. ET AL., IMMUNOBIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 201, no. 5, pages 527 - 40 | - WEINBERG, A. ET AL., IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 164, pages 2160 - 2169 | - MELERO, I. ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1997), vol. 3, pages 682 - 685 | - HUTLOFF, A. ET AL., NATURE, (1999), vol. 397, pages 262 - 266 | - HOLLIGER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - POLJAK, STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123 | - HE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 173, pages 4919 - 28 | - "Development of Cancer Vaccines", ROSENBERG, S., ASCO Educational Book Spring, pages 60 - 62 | - LOGOTHETIS, C., ASCO Educational Book S, (2000), pages 300 - 302 | - KHAYAT, D, ASCO EDUCATIONAL BOOK SPRING, (2000), pages 414 - 428 | - FOON, K., ASCO Educational Book Spring, (2000), pages 730 - 738 | - RESTIFO, N; SZNOL, M., Cancer Vaccines, pages 3023 - 3043 | - DRANOFF ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1993), vol. 90, pages 3539 - 43 | - KIM, N ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, pages 2011 - 2013 | - SUOT, R; SRIVASTAVA, P, SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 269, pages 1585 - 1588 | - TAMURA, Y. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 278, pages 117 - 120 | - NESTLE, F. ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1998), vol. 4, pages 328 - 332 | - KUGLER, A ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2000), vol. 6, pages 332 - 336 | - HANNE ET AL., "AZD9291 in EGFR Inhibitor-Resistant Non-Small-Cell Lung Cancer", N ENGL J MED, (2015), vol. 372, pages 1689 - 99 | - SEQUIST ET AL., "Rociletinib in EGFR-Mutated Non-Small-Cell Lung Cancer", J MED, (2015), vol. 372, pages 1700 - 9 | - SAKAGAMI ET AL., "ASP8273, a novel mutant-selective irreversible EGFR inhibitor, inhibits growth of non-small cell lung cancer (NSCLC) cells with EGFR activating and T790M resistance mutations", AACR; CANCER RES, (2014), vol. 74, page 1728 | - THERASSE ET AL., "New Guidelines to Evaluate the Response to Treatment in Solid Tumors", JOURNAL OF NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE, (2000), vol. 92, pages 205 - 16 | - EISENHAUER ET AL., EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, (2009), vol. 45, pages 228 - 247 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PRINTING COMPANY, (1990), pages 1289 - 1329 | - DONG ET AL., NAT MED, (2002), vol. 8, pages 787 - 9 | - DONG ET AL., J MOL MED, (2003), vol. 81, pages 281 - 7 | - BLANK ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER, (2005), vol. 54, pages 307 - 314 | - IWAI ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 17, pages 133 - 144 | - MOKYR, M. ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 58, pages 5301 - 5304 | - PRESTA ET AL., CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, pages 4593 - 4599 | - POPKOV, JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (2004), vol. 288, pages 149 - 164 | - LI ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (2007), vol. 87, pages 225 - 230 | - LIU ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2007), vol. 17, pages 617 - 620 | - COOK, R., J MANAG CARE PHARM, (2008), vol. 14, no. 7, pages 19 - 25 | - HALLETT, WHD ET AL., J OF AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BLOOD AND MARROW TRANSPLANTATION, (2011), vol. 17, no. 8, pages 1133 - 145 | - YI, Q, CANCER J., (2009), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 502 - 10 | - RINI, B.I. ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2010), vol. 28, no. 13, pages 2137 - 2143 | - PAL. S.K ET AL., CLIN. ADVANCES IN HEMATOLOGY & ONCOLOGY, (2014), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 90 - 99 | - HUDES, G ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED, (2007), vol. 356, no. 22, pages 2271 - 2281 | - MOTZER, R.J. ET AL., LANCET, (2008), vol. 372, pages 449 - 456 | - PENG ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2011), vol. 29, pages 886 - 891 | - SEAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 332, no. 6030, pages 687 - 696 | - FREY; DUECK, SCIENCE, (2007), pages 972 - 976 | WO1986US02269 |