EP3136646 - SECURE DATA INTERACTION METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tendyron Corporation 1810, Tower B No. 38 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Dongsheng 1810 Tower B No. 38 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/09] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15782867.4 | 30.01.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015CN72057 | Priority number, date | CN201410172028 | 25.04.2014 Original published format: CN201410172028 | CN201410171785 | 25.04.2014 Original published format: CN201410171785 | [2017/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015161699 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3136646 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3136646 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04L9/08, H04L29/06, G06Q20/40, H04W12/06 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
H04L9/088 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (US);
H04L63/0869 (EP,US);
H04L63/101 (EP,US);
H04L9/32 (US);
H04L9/3234 (EP,US);
H04L9/3273 (EP,US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/09] | H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERES DATENINTERAKTIONSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM | [2017/09] | English: | SECURE DATA INTERACTION METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2017/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'INTERACTION DE DONNÉES SÉCURISÉS | [2017/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2016 | Translation filed | 24.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 24.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2015 | AL | 03.03.2021 | AT | 03.03.2021 | CY | 03.03.2021 | CZ | 03.03.2021 | DK | 03.03.2021 | EE | 03.03.2021 | ES | 03.03.2021 | FI | 03.03.2021 | HR | 03.03.2021 | IT | 03.03.2021 | LT | 03.03.2021 | LV | 03.03.2021 | MC | 03.03.2021 | MK | 03.03.2021 | MT | 03.03.2021 | NL | 03.03.2021 | PL | 03.03.2021 | RO | 03.03.2021 | RS | 03.03.2021 | SE | 03.03.2021 | SI | 03.03.2021 | SK | 03.03.2021 | SM | 03.03.2021 | TR | 03.03.2021 | BG | 03.06.2021 | NO | 03.06.2021 | GR | 04.06.2021 | IS | 03.07.2021 | PT | 05.07.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 30.01.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
MK | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
TR | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.01.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
MK | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 30.01.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.01.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE102006027253 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0085]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0133] * [A] 2-8,10-15; | [A]US2009076966 (BISHOP FRED A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0117] ** paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0140] *; | [XI]WO2011031988 (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0051]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0114]; figures 2-4,6 * [I] 2-8,10-15 | International search | [A]CN101483654 (BEIJING HUADA ZHIBAO ELECTRONI [CN]) [A] 1-32 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103516525 (TENDYRON TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-32* , the whole document *; | [PX]CN103942690 (TENDYRON TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-32 * , claims 1-27 *; | [PX]CN103944736 (TENDYRON TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-32 * , claims 1-16, and description, paragraphs [0007]-[0033] *; | [PX]CN103944728 (TENDYRON TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-32 * , claims 1-16, and description, paragraphs [0007]-[0024] * |