EP3135172 - ELECTRIC CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Lifestyle Products & Services Corporation 25-1 Ekimae-honcho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8543 / JP | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIKAWA, Hiromitsu c/o Intellectual Property Group Toshiba Lifestyle Products & Services Corporation 25-1, Ekimae-honcho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8543 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Masatoshi c/o Intellectual Property Group Toshiba Lifestyle Products & Services Corporation 25-1, Ekimae-honcho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8543 / JP | 03 /
MORISHITA, Atsushi c/o Intellectual Property Group Toshiba Lifestyle Products & Services Corporation 25-1, Ekimae-honcho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8543 / JP | 04 /
MACHIDA, Yukio c/o Intellectual Property Group Toshiba Lifestyle Products & Services Corporation 25-1, Ekimae-honcho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8543 / JP | 05 /
MURATA, Hiromitsu c/o Intellectual Property Group Toshiba Lifestyle Products & Services Corporation 25-1, Ekimae-honcho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8543 / JP | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15782923.5 | 22.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015JP62264 | Priority number, date | JP20140088361 | 22.04.2014 Original published format: JP 2014088361 | [2017/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015163373 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3135172 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/28, A47L9/04 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
A47L9/0488 (EP,KR);
A47L9/2847 (EP,KR);
A47L11/4052 (US);
A47L11/4038 (US);
A47L11/4041 (US);
A47L11/4061 (US);
A47L11/4066 (US);
A47L11/4069 (US);
A47L9/04 (US);
A47L9/0466 (KR);
A47L9/0472 (EP);
A47L9/0477 (EP);
A47L9/28 (US);
A47L9/2852 (EP,KR);
A47L9/2884 (EP);
B25J11/0085 (KR);
B25J9/0003 (KR);
B25J9/162 (KR);
B25J9/1664 (KR);
B25J9/1666 (KR);
A47L2201/022 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER REINIGER | [2017/09] | English: | ELECTRIC CLEANER | [2017/09] | French: | ASPIRATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2017/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2016 | Translation filed | 20.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 20.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2578127 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4 * column 4, paragraph 25 - paragraph 26 * * column 4, paragraph 32 * * column 6, paragraph 51 - column 9, paragraph 92 * * figures 1-12 *; | [X]EP2604163 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-4 * abstract ** figures 1-8 *; | [X]US2013291331 (YANG HAESEOCK [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 1, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 1, column l, paragraph 8 * * page 4, column r, paragraph 78 - page 5, column l, paragraph 98 * * figures 6-9 * | International search | [X]JPS62292124 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-2* , page 2, upper right column, line 14 to lower left column, line 13; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2013081775 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0103] to [0106]; fig. 2, 12 & WO 2013/051843 A & EP 2578125 A1 & EP 2578126 A1 & EP 2578127 A1 & KR 10-2013-0037448 A & CN 103027634 A & AU 2012319325 A * |