EP3134010 - LEFT ATRIAL APPENDAGE OCCLUSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flow Medtech, LLC 195 14th Street NE Unit 1904 Atlanta, Georgia 30309 / US | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAKRABORTY, Arnab Ranjan 1 Briarwood Court Johnson City, Tennessee 37604 / US | 02 /
HANG, Christine Tu-Anh 201 Live Oak Road Aiken, South Carolina 29803 / US | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2020/17] |
Former [2017/09] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15783150.4 | 24.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015US27666 | Priority number, date | US201461984342P | 25.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461984342 P | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015164836 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3134010 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3134010 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
A61B17/12122 (EP,US);
A61B17/12031 (EP,US);
A61B17/12136 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1205 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DAS LINKE HERZOHR | [2017/09] | English: | LEFT ATRIAL APPENDAGE OCCLUSION DEVICE | [2017/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OCCLUSION DE L'APPENDICE AURICULAIRE GAUCHE | [2017/09] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 25.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2015 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | IE | 24.04.2020 | LU | 24.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | FR | 22.06.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | DE | 03.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.04.2015 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 22.06.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
DE | 03.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 22.06.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
DE | 03.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
DE | 03.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
DE | 03.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
DE | 03.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
DE | 03.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
DE | 03.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007130724 (NORTHWIND VENTURES [US], et al) [A] 1,11,13 * figure 5 ** paragraph [0061] *; | [IY]WO2013192332 (KRISHNAN SUBRAMANIAM CHITOOR [US]) [I] 1-10 * figures 4, 14 * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0070] * [Y] 11-13; | [YA]US2014039536 (CULLY EDWARD H [US], et al) [Y] 11-13 * figures 3, 5 * * paragraph [0069] * [A] 1 | International search | [A]US2008033457 (FRANCISCHELLI DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2011022079 (MILES SCOTT D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011178539 (HOLMES JR DAVID R [US], et al) [Y] 9-15, 17-19 * entire document *; | [XY]US2012271343 (BORILLO THOMAS E [US], et al) [X] 20 * entire document * [Y] 1-8, 11, 13, 15, 18, 19; | [A]US2012283585 (WERNETH RANDELL L [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014058371 (KRISHNAN SUBRAMANIAM CHITOOR [US]) [Y] 1-15, 17-19 * entire document * |