13.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.07.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
01.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.11.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.10.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.09.2018 |
First examination report |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.11.2017 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
03.11.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
03.11.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
30.06.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
30.06.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
31.05.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.02.2017 |
Change - inventor |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
08.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
27.01.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
27.01.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
06.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
11.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|