EP3135479 - GAS BARRIER MULTILAYER FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI Iori c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD. 5-1 Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | 02 /
KASHIMURA Masayuki c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD. 5-1 Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | 03 /
MATSUI Miyu c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/09] | Application number, filing date | 15783657.8 | 23.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015JP62384 | Priority number, date | JP20140092050 | 25.04.2014 Original published format: JP 2014092050 | [2017/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015163413 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3135479 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/00, B05D3/02, B32B27/30, B65D65/40, C08J7/04 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
C23C14/0021 (EP,US);
B65D65/40 (US);
B05D1/305 (US);
B05D3/0254 (US);
C08J7/0423 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/048 (EP,US);
C23C14/081 (EP,US);
C23C14/30 (EP,US);
B05D7/04 (EP,US);
C08J2323/06 (EP,US);
C08J2323/12 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08J2403/02 (EP,US);
C08J2405/00 (EP,US);
C08J2423/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/09] | B32B9/00, B05D3/02, B32B27/30, B65D65/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Title | German: | GASSPERRENMEHRSCHICHTFOLIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/09] | English: | GAS BARRIER MULTILAYER FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2017/09] | French: | FILM MULTICOUCHE DE BARRIÈRE CONTRE DES GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA PRODUCTION | [2017/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2016 | Translation filed | 11.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 11.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/51] | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5709951 (SATO TOMOAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0013] - [0015] - [0 18] , [0 22]; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP1086981 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3* claims 1-9 * | International search | [A]JPH0841218 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3* , entire text (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP3024995U (Kureha Chemical Industry Co., Ltd.) [X] 1-3 * , claim 2; paragraphs [0009], [0015], [0016], [0018], [0020], [0028] (Family: none) * [Y] 1-3; | [A]JP2001334600 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2002347793 (KAGOME KK, et al) [A] 1-3 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005225940 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-3 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0012], [0020], [0021], [0026] to [0028], [0030], [0031], [0037], [0038]; table 1 (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2006027638 (KUREHA CORP) [X] 1-3 * , claims; paragraphs [0022], [0024] to [0026], [0029], [0032], [0034], [0036], [0038], [0044], [0088], [0102], [0103] (Family: none) * [Y] 1-3; | [XY]JP2008036914 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [X] 1-3 * , claims; paragraphs [0012], [0018] to [0021], [0040], [0041], [0052], [0069], [0070] (Family: none) * [Y] 1-3 |