EP3134599 - RIG MAST AND RELATED COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drill Rig Spares Pty Ltd 3/636 Progress Road Wacol, Queensland 4076 / AU | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUTTON, Ross Clive 105 Lather Road Bellbowrie, Queensland 4070 / AU | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/09] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15783717.0 | 24.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015AU00244 | Priority number, date | AU20140901481 | 24.04.2014 Original published format: AU 2014901481 | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015161341 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3134599 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3134599 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B1/00, E21B7/02, B66C23/30, B66C23/36, B66C23/60, E21B15/00 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
E21B7/023 (EP,US);
B66C23/42 (US);
B66C23/701 (US);
E21B15/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/09] | E21B1/00, E21B7/02, B66C23/30, B66C23/36, B66C23/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOHRGESTELLMAST UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2017/09] | English: | RIG MAST AND RELATED COMPONENTS | [2017/09] | French: | MÂT POUR APPAREIL DE FORAGE ET COMPOSANTS ASSOCIÉS | [2017/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 24.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.07.2018 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | MT | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | RS | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | PT | 04.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
MT | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2703634 (LEE FRANCIS H) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1752608 (NAT OILWELL LP [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [X]US2817495 (JOHN PEARL EUGENE) [X] 1-6, 16 * Figs. 1 & 4; column 1 line 65 - column 2 line 7; column 2 line 60 - column 3 line 14 *; | [X]US3109523 (MOLLER BYNUM W) [X] 1-6, 16 * Figs. 1-8; column 3 line 32 - column 4 line 7; column 6 lines 8-14 *; | [X]US3905168 (NELMARK JACK D, et al) [X] 1-6, 16 * Figs. 1-4; column 4 lines 12-57; column 6 lines 10-19 *; | [X]US3992831 (BUKOVITZ RONALD FRANCIS, et al) [X] 1-6, 16 * Figs. 1-4; column 3 line 52 - column 4 lines 55 *; | [X]US4016687 (GRIFFITH T W, et al) [X] 1-6, 16 * Figs. 1-4; column 2 line 9 - column 4 line 4 *; | [X]US4138805 (PATTERSON BRADLEY C) [X] 1-6, 16 * Figs. 1-7; column 3 lines 14-57 *; | [X]US4290495 (ELLISTON THOMAS L) [X] 1-6, 16 * Figs. 1-7; column 9 lines 32-60; column 12 lines 27-47 *; | [X]US4465144 (GUGGER HANS [AU], et al) [X] 1-6, 16 * Figs. 1-3; column 2 lines 23-63 *; | [X]US4703812 (JOHNSON CLARENCE W [CA]) [X] 1-6, 16 * Figs. 1-3; column 2 lines 50-61; column 5 lines 36-39 *; | [X]US5794723 (CANEER JR CLIFFORD [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 16 * Figs. 1-4; column 4 lines 19-46 *; | [X]US6298927 (BACK CARL F [US]) [X] 1-6, 16* Figs. 1-3; column 6 line 60 - column 7 line 14 *; | [X]CA2474991 (1076559 ALBERTA LTD [CA]) [X] 1-6, 16 * Figs. 1-3; page 2 line 21 - page 4 line 20 * |