EP3205030 - DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM FOR MIMO SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andrew Wireless Systems GmbH 1100 CommScope Place, SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARLAZZI, Luigi 8749 Southwestern Boulevard Dallas, TX 75206 / US | 02 /
BRIGHENTI, Samuele Viale Cimatti 20 I-48018 Faenza (RA) / IT | 03 /
FACCIN, Pier Vicolo Molino 8/D I-48018 Savingnano S/R (FC) / IT | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15784193.3 | 01.10.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015US53484 | Priority number, date | US201414510883 | 09.10.2014 Original published format: US201414510883 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016057304 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205030 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/02, H04B7/04, H01Q1/24, H01Q13/20, H01Q21/28, H04W88/08 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
H01Q21/28 (EP,CN,KR);
H04B7/022 (EP,CN,KR);
H01Q1/246 (EP,CN,KR);
H01Q13/20 (EP,CN,KR);
H04B7/0413 (EP,CN,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Title | German: | VERTEILTES ANTENNENSYSTEM FÜR MIMO-SIGNALE | [2017/33] | English: | DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM FOR MIMO SIGNALS | [2017/33] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANTENNES DISTRIBUÉES POUR SIGNAUX MIMO | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 24.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/16] | 15.03.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.03.2023 | 21.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010075865 (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X]WO2012075137 (ANDREW WIRELESS SYSTEMS GMBH [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077] *; | [X]US2013188753 (TARLAZZI LUIGI [IT], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0037] * * abstract * |