EP3218348 - REDUCING HYDROGEN IODIDE CONTENT IN CARBONYLATION PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese International Corporation 222 W. Las Colinas Blvd., Suite 900N Irving, TX 75039 / US | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAVER, Ronald D. 16415 Heather Bend Court Houston, Texas 77059 / US | 02 /
LIU, Yaw-Hwa 3610 Belmont Shore Court Missouri City, Texas 77459 / US | 03 /
SCATES, Mark O. 18117 Sandy Cove Houston, Texas 77058 / US | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Serravalle, Marco, et al Marco Serravalle S.L. Calle Galicia, 18 - Apt. E5 38660 Adeje / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | Serravalle, Marco Serravalle SAS Via G. Matteotti, 21/23 26854 Cornegliano Laudense (LO) / IT | Application number, filing date | 15784195.8 | 02.10.2015 | [2017/38] | WO2015US53682 | Priority number, date | US201462079961P | 14.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462079961 P | US201514694883 | 23.04.2015 Original published format: US201514694883 | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016076968 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3218348 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3218348 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/12, C07C53/08, C07C51/44 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
C07C51/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C51/44 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C51/48 (KR);
C07C53/08 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/12, C07C53/08 (CN,EP,US);
C07C51/44, C07C53/08 (US,CN,EP) |
Former IPC [2017/38] | C07C51/12, C07C53/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REDUKTION DES WASSERSTOFFIODIDGEHALTS IN CARBONYLIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/38] | English: | REDUCING HYDROGEN IODIDE CONTENT IN CARBONYLATION PROCESSES | [2017/38] | French: | REDUCTION DE LA TENEUR EN IODURE D'HYDROGENE DANS DES PROCEDES DE CARBONYLATION | [2017/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 07.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2015 | AL | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | IE | 02.10.2020 | LU | 02.10.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 02.10.2015 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 02.10.2020 | ||
LU | 02.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.10.2015 | |
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 02.10.2020 | ||
LU | 02.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 02.10.2020 | ||
LU | 02.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9950218 (HALDOR TOPSOE AS [DK], et al); | [YD]US6339171 (SINGH MADAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2012090980 (TORRENCE G PAULL [US], et al); | [IDY]US8318977 (ZINOBILE RAYMOND J [US], et al); | [YD]US2013116470 (MIURA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) | Examination | US2009088587 | WO2010053571 | by applicant | US3769329 | US5001259 | US5026908 | US5144068 | US6143930 | US6339171 | US6677480 | US2006011462 | US7223886 | US7223883 | US7855306 | US7884237 | US2011288333 | US8318977 | US2013116470 | US8889904 |