EP3204214 - ANCHORING A JOINING ELEMENT IN AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WoodWelding AG Mühlebach 2 6362 Stansstad / CH | For all designated states Inter IKEA Systems B.V. Olof Palmestraat 1 2616 LN Delft / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states WoodWelding AG Mühlebach 2 6362 Stansstad / CH | ||
For all designated states Inter IKEA Systems B.V. Olof Palmestraat 1 2616 LN Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIZDAR, Nihat Transbärsvägen 8 S-283 35 Osby / SE | 02 /
KÄLL, Håkan Kultevägen 4 S-343 93 Ålmhult / SE | 03 /
HÅKANSSON, Pontus Östergatan 46 343 32 Ålmhult / SE | 04 /
SANKARAN, Muthumariappan Stenhuggarevägen 31 S-343 33 Ålmhult / SE | 05 /
LEHMANN, Mario Haut-du-Village 31 CH-2353 Les Pommerats / CH | 06 /
MAYER, Jörg Lerchenweg 6 CH-5702 Niederlenz / CH | 07 /
TORRIANI, Laurent La Reposière 2 CH-2516 Lamboing / CH | 08 /
AESCHLIMANN, Marcel Dorfgasse 65 CH-2514 Ligerz / CH | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 15784265.9 | 02.10.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015CH00149 | Priority number, date | CH20140001539 | 09.10.2014 Original published format: CH 15392014 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016054751 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3204214 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/64, B29C65/60, B29C65/78, B29C65/08 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
B29C65/08 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/3032 (US);
B29C65/565 (US);
B29C65/603 (EP,CN,US);
B29C65/609 (EP,CN,US);
B29C65/645 (EP,CN,US);
B29C65/7808 (EP,US);
B29C65/7844 (EP,US);
B29C66/30321 (US);
B29C66/30325 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/474 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/7392 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/74 (US);
B29C66/7487 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/81429 (EP,US);
B29C66/8145 (US);
B29C66/872 (EP,US);
B29C66/9231 (EP,US);
B29C66/9261 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/08 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2055/02 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2059/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2071/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2079/085 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2017/33] | B29C65/64, B29C65/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Title | German: | VERANKERUNG EINES FÜGEELEMENTS IN EINEM OBJEKT | [2017/33] | English: | ANCHORING A JOINING ELEMENT IN AN OBJECT | [2017/33] | French: | ANCRAGE D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE JONCTION DANS UN OBJET | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 17.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE4317621 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [A]WO9701432 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [XI]WO2008080238 (WOODWELDING AG [CH], et al); | [XI]WO2008095327 (WOODWELDING AG [CH], et al); | [XI]JP2009295269 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [XI]WO2014075200 (WOODWELDING AG [CH]) | by applicant | WO9842988 | WO2013104422 | WO2015EP61853 |