Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10087047 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2018 | B2 | US2017334681 | 23.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14190022 | 23.10.2014 | WO2015EP74558 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107074500B | Global Dossier | 16.04.2019 | B | CN107074500 | 18.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14190022 | 23.10.2014 | WO2015EP74558 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2965049 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14190022 | 23.10.2014 | WO2015EP74558 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015334875B | Global Dossier | 03.01.2019 | B2 | AU2015334875 | 18.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14190022 | 23.10.2014 | WO2015EP74558 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3209591 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2018 | B1 | EP3209591 | 30.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14190022 | 23.10.2014 | WO2015EP74558 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017005176 | 27.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14190022 | 23.10.2014 | WO2015EP74558 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016062840 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14190022 | 23.10.2014 |