EP3210267 - OPEN-LOOP WAVELENGTH SELECTIVE EXTERNAL RESONATOR AND BEAM COMBINING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRUMPF Laser GmbH Aichhalder Strasse 39 78713 Schramberg / DE | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILLI, Alexander Austrasse 17 78647 Trossingen / DE | 02 /
RIED, Steffen Uhlandstrasse 39 78628 Rottweil / DE | 03 /
TILLKORN, Christoph Robert-Bosch-Strasse 12 78667 Villingendorf / DE | 04 /
ZIMER, Hagen Heubergstrasse 23 78655 Dunningen-Seedorf / DE | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/35] | Application number, filing date | 15784633.8 | 21.10.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015EP74348 | Priority number, date | US201414521487 | 23.10.2014 Original published format: US201414521487 | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016062758 | Date: | 28.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3210267 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/40, H01S3/08, H01S5/14 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
H01S5/4062 (EP,CN,US);
H01S5/4068 (EP,CN,US);
H01S3/0805 (EP,US);
H01S5/141 (EP,US);
H01S5/4012 (EP,US);
H01S5/4031 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Title | German: | WELLENLÄNGENSELEKTIVER EXTERNER RESONATOR MIT OFFENEM REGELKREIS UND STRAHLKOMBINATIONSSYSTEM | [2017/35] | English: | OPEN-LOOP WAVELENGTH SELECTIVE EXTERNAL RESONATOR AND BEAM COMBINING SYSTEM | [2017/35] | French: | RÉSONATEUR EXTERNE À SÉLECTIVITÉ DE LONGUEUR D'ONDE À BOUCLE OUVERTE ET SYSTÈME DE COMBINAISON DE FAISCEAUX | [2017/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 30.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US5386426 (STEPHENS RONALD R [US]) [X] 1-6,11,17,18 * column 5, line 14 - column 8, line 68; figures 5,15 * * column 10, lines 47-51 * [Y] 7-10,12,13,19,20 [I] 7-10,14-16,20; | [Y]US6665471 (FARMER JASON N [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * column 2, lines 20-21 * * column 3, line 4 - column 6, line 2; figure 2 *; | [Y]US5793784 (WAGSHUL MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * column 3, line 65 - column 6, line 32; figures 1,2 *; | [XP]WO2015075102 (TRUMPF LASER GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-7,11,17,18 * paragraphs [0096] - [0114]; figures 12,13 * | by applicant | US8724222 | US8553327 |