EP3213510 - A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ESTIMATING A COLOR MAPPING BETWEEN TWO DIFFERENT COLOR-GRADED VERSIONS OF A PICTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2020/01] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US | ||
Former [2017/36] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORDES, Philippe c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 avenue des Champs-Blancs CS17616 F-35576 Cesson Sevigne / FR | 02 /
LASSERRE, Sebastien c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 avenue des Champs-Blancs CS17616 F-35576 Cesson Sevigne / FR | 03 /
ANDRIVON, Pierre c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs-Blancs CS17616 F-35576 Cesson Sevigne / FR | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Labelle, Lilian, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | Labelle, Lilian, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 15784663.5 | 22.10.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015EP74496 | Priority number, date | EP20140306724 | 29.10.2014 Original published format: EP 14306724 | [2017/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016066519 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3213510 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/67, G09G5/02, G06T7/40, H04N1/60, G03B21/20, H04N21/41, G06T7/00 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
G06T7/90 (EP,US);
G06T5/90 (EP,US);
G09G5/06 (EP,US);
H04N1/6066 (EP,US);
H04N9/67 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHÄTZUNG EINER FARBZUORDNUNG ZWISCHEN ZWEI VERSIONEN MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHER FARBGRADIERUNG EINER SEQUENZ VON BILDERN | [2017/36] | English: | A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ESTIMATING A COLOR MAPPING BETWEEN TWO DIFFERENT COLOR-GRADED VERSIONS OF A PICTURE | [2017/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ESTIMATION D'UNE MISE EN CORRESPONDANCE DE COULEURS ENTRE DEUX VERSIONS À ÉTALONNAGE DE COULEURS DIFFÉRENTES D'UNE IMAGE | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 20.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6362808 (EDGE CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 47 ** column 12, line 6 - line 13 *; | [A]US2012070082 (TIN SIU-KEI [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] *; | [A]US2013002810 (STAUDER JUERGEN [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0131] *; | [A]WO2013009651 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0071] *; | [XI] - YOUNGBAE HWANG ET AL, "Color Transfer Using Probabilistic Moving Least Squares", 2014 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, (20140601), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2014.427, ISBN 978-1-47-995118-5, pages 3342 - 3349, XP055186783 [X] 10 * abstract * * figure 1 * * 1. Introduction * * 3.1. Moving least squares framework * * 3.2. Probabilistic Modeling of the Color Transfer * [I] 1-9,11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2014.427 | Examination | WO2015144566 |