EP3205104 - DIAGONAL COPY FOR PALETTE MODE CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PU, Wei 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
KARCZEWICZ, Marta 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SEREGIN, Vadim 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
ZOU, Feng 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
JOSHI, Rajan Laxman 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
SOLE ROJALS, Joel 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2017/33] | Application number, filing date | 15784837.5 | 06.10.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015US54271 | Priority number, date | US201462060419P | 06.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462060419 P | US201514875398 | 05.10.2015 Original published format: US201514875398 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016057534 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3205104 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/593, H04N19/70 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/186 (US);
H04N19/182 (US);
H04N19/593 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Title | German: | DIAGONALKOPIE FÜR PALETTENCODIERUNGSMODUS | [2017/33] | English: | DIAGONAL COPY FOR PALETTE MODE CODING | [2017/33] | French: | COPIE DIAGONALE POUR CODAGE EN MODE PALETTE | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 27.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 19.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y] - PU W ET AL, "SCCE3: Test B.12 ' Binarization of Escape Sample and Palette Index", 18. JCT-VC MEETING; 30-6-2014 - 9-7-2014; SAPPORO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140621), no. JCTVC-R0065, XP030116309 [Y] 1-29 * sections 1.1.2 and 1.1.3 * | [Y] - ZHU J ET AL, "Non-SCCE3: Modified copy above mode for palette based coding", 18. JCT-VC MEETING; 30-6-2014 - 9-7-2014; SAPPORO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140702), no. JCTVC-R0078-v2, XP030116327 [Y] 1-29 * figure 3 * | [Y] - ZHU J ET AL, "AHG10: Adaptive Scan Order on Palette Based Coding", 17. JCT-VC MEETING; 27-3-2014 - 4-4-2014; VALENCIA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140329), no. JCTVC-Q0169-v2, XP030116116 [Y] 3,14 * section 2.1 * | [Y] - LAROCHE G ET AL, "SCCE3: Test B.7 - Run coding", 18. JCT-VC MEETING; 30-6-2014 - 9-7-2014; SAPPORO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140620), no. JCTVC-R0085, XP030116337 [Y] 4,5,15,16 * section 1 first paragraph * | [Y] - "Working Draft 1 of HEVC Screen Content Coding", 109. MPEG MEETING;7-7-2014 - 11-7-2014; SAPPORO; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20140826), no. N14702, XP030021438 [Y] 7,8,18,19 * page 100 last paragraph * | [XPY] - PU W ET AL, "Non-CE6: Syntax Redundancy Fixes for Palette Mode", 19. JCT-VC MEETING; 17-10-2014 - 24-10-2014; STRASBOURG; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20141021), no. JCTVC-S0110-v4, XP030116863 [XP] 1-8,11-19,22-29 * the whole document * [Y] 9,10,20,21 | [Y] - LAROCHE G ET AL, "Non-RCE4: On Palette prediction modes coding", 16. JCT-VC MEETING; 9-1-2014 - 17-1-2014; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140110), no. JCTVC-P0116-v4, XP030115614 [Y] 9,20 * section 2.1 * | [Y] - PU W ET AL, "AHG10: Simplification of Palette Based Coding", 17. JCT-VC MEETING; 27-3-2014 - 4-4-2014; VALENCIA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140328), no. JCTVC-Q0047-v3, XP030115937 [Y] 9,20 * section 2.3 last paragraph * | [Y] - Y-C SUN ET AL, "Non-RCE4: Cross-CU major color index prediction", 16. JCT-VC MEETING; 9-1-2014 - 17-1-2014; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140109), no. JCTVC-P0093-v3, XP030115576 [Y] 10,21 * section 1 * | [YP] - SEREGIN V ET AL, "Non-CE6: Palette copy above mode for the first row", 19. JCT-VC MEETING; 17-10-2014 - 24-10-2014; STRASBOURG; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20141008), no. JCTVC-S0155, XP030116927 [YP] 9,10,20,21 * the whole document * | by applicant | - BROSS ET AL., "High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC) Text Specification Draft 10 (for FDIS & Consent", JCVC-L1003_V13, 12A' MEETING OF JCT-VC OFITU-T SG16 WP 3 AND ISO/IEC JCT 1/SC 29/WG 11, (20130114), URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/ict/doc end user/documents/12 Geneva/wg11/JCTVC-L1003-v13.zip. Another draft of HEVC is available from http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jct/doc_end_user/documents/12_Geneva/wg11/JCTVC-L1003-v14.zip | - JOSHI, THE JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT-VC) OFITU-T SG 16 WP 3 AND ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11, 18TH MEETING, (20140630), URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jct/doc end user/current document.php?id=9471 |