EP3197501 - BIOLOGICAL MATERIALS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Antikor Biopharma Limited Stevenage Bioscience Catalyst Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2FX / GB | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEONARAIN, Mahendra Persaud 47 Bandon Rise Wallington, Surrey SM6 8PT / GB | 02 /
YAHIOGLU, Gokhan 81 Wades Hill London N21 1AU / GB | 03 /
STAMATI, Ioanna Flat 2 5 Langland Gardens London NW3 6QD / GB | 04 /
SAOUROS, Savvas Warden Flat Beit Hall Prince Consort Road London SW7 2BB / GB | 05 /
KAPADNIS, Prashant Bhimrao 40 Mill Court Edinburgh Gate Harlow Essex CM20 2JG / GB | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2024/15] |
Former [2017/31] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15785171.8 | 25.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015GB52800 | Priority number, date | GB20140016960 | 25.09.2014 Original published format: GB 201416960 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016046574 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3197501 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3197501 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, A61P35/00 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
A61K47/6803 (EP,US);
A61K47/68031 (EP,US);
A61K47/68033 (EP,US);
A61K47/68035 (EP,US);
A61K47/68037 (EP,US);
A61K47/6809 (EP,US);
A61K47/6835 (EP);
A61K47/6855 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP);
A61P33/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61K47/00 (US);
C07K16/00 (US);
C07K2317/92 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/31] | A61K47/50, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCHE MATERIALIEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/31] | English: | BIOLOGICAL MATERIALS AND USES THEREOF | [2017/31] | French: | MATÉRIELS BIOLOGIQUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 20.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007042775 (PHOTOBIOTICS LTD [GB], et al); | [XY]WO2010141566 (IMMUNOGEN INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2014068443 (PFIZER [US]); |