EP3139605 - ENCODING METHOD, DECODING METHOD, ENCODING APPARATUS, AND DECODING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAING, Sue Mon Thet c/o Panasonic Int.Prop.Management Co.,Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
LIM, Chong Soon c/o Panasonic Int.Prop.Management Co.,Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
SASAI, Hisao c/o Panasonic Int.Prop.Management Co.,Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
TERADA, Kengo c/o Panasonic Int.Prop.Management Co.,Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
YOSHIKAWA, Satoshi c/o Panasonic Int.Prop.Management Co.,Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/10] | Application number, filing date | 15785284.9 | 17.04.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015JP02110 | Priority number, date | JP20140093071 | 28.04.2014 Original published format: JP 2014093071 | US201462003582P | 28.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462003582 P | JP20150021590 | 05.02.2015 Original published format: JP 2015021590 | [2017/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015166639 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3139605 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/105, H04N19/157, H04N19/176, H04N19/52, H04N19/70, H04N19/44, H04N19/593, H04N19/56 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
H04N19/157 (EP,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,US);
H04N19/139 (US);
H04N19/172 (US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/44 (EP,US);
H04N19/52 (EP,US);
H04N19/56 (EP,US);
H04N19/593 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/10] | H04N19/105, H04N19/157, H04N19/176, H04N19/52, H04N19/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Title | German: | CODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, DECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, CODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/10] | English: | ENCODING METHOD, DECODING METHOD, ENCODING APPARATUS, AND DECODING APPARATUS | [2017/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE, APPAREIL DE CODAGE ET APPAREIL DE DÉCODAGE | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2016 | Translation filed | 08.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 20.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1919223 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11,13,15,16 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 23] - [0028] - [0 55] - [0147] - [ 179] * * figures 1-20 * [I] 3,5,7,10,12,14; | [A]US2012044996 (SATO KAZUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0143] - [0168] - [ 185] - [0195] - [ 266] - [0273] - [ 280] - [0287] - [ 288] - [0303] ** figures 8-11, 13, 27, 29, 30 *; | [XI] - Y-W HUANG ET AL, "TE1: Decoder-side motion vector derivation with switchable template matching", 2. JCT-VC MEETING; 21-7-2010 - 28-7-2010; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVETEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL:HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20100723), no. JCTVC-B076, ISSN 0000-0046, XP030007656 [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11,13,15,16 * abstract * * sections 1, 2, 2.2 * * figure 6 * [I] 3,5,7,10,12,14 | International search | [XA]JP2007043651 (NTT DOCOMO INC) [X] 1-2, 5-9, 14-16 * , paragraphs [0023] to [0028], [0055] to [0145]; fig. 1 to 20 & WO 2007/004678 A1 & KR 10-2008-0019294 A & EP 1919223 A1 & CN 101218829 A & US 2009/0116759 A1 & RU 2008104131 A * [A] 3-4, 10-13; | [A]WO2010095560 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings & TW 201032600 A & CN 102318346 A & US 2012/0044996 A1 & RU 2011134049 A *; | [A]WO2011002809 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2011/0002388 A1 & TW 201130316 A & KR 10-2012-0042910 A & EP 2449786 A & CN 102474622 A & JP 2012-532501 A *; | [A]WO2011071514 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings & EP 2510697 A & CN 102742268 A & US 2012/0281752 A1 & KR 10-2012-0126067 A & JP 2013-513333 A *; | [XA] - YU-WEN HUANG et al., "TE1: Decoder-Side Motion Vector Derivation with Switchable Template Matching", Joint Collaborative Team on Video Coding (JCT-VC) of ITU-T SG 16 WP3 and ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11, JCTVC-B076, 2nd Meeting, Geneva, CH, (20100700), pages 1 - 11, XP030007656 [X] 1-2, 5-9, 14-16 [A] 3-4, 10-13 | [A] - MATHIAS WIEN et al., "TE1: RWTH partner report on DMVD", Joint Collaborative Team on Video Coding (JCT-VC) of ITU-T SG 16 WP3 and ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11, JCTVC-B030, 2nd Meeting, Geneva, CH, (20100700), pages 1 - 14, XP030007610 [A] 1-16 | [A] - YU-WEN HUANG et al., "A Technical Description of MediaTek's Proposal to the JCT-VC CfP", Joint Collaborative Team on Video Coding (JCT-VC) of ITU-T SG 16 WP3 and ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11, JCTVC-A109_r2, 1st Meeting, Dresden, DE, (20100400), pages 1, 24 - 27, XP002664256 [A] 1-16 | [A] - "Steffen Kamp and Mathias Wien, Multi-hypothesis prediction with decoder side motion vector derivation", Joint Video Team (JVT) of ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG (ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 and ITU-T SG 16 Q.6), JVT-AA040, 27th Meeting, Geneva, CH, (20080400), pages 1 - 11, XP030007383 [A] 1-16 |