EP3076296 - COMPUTER, CONTROL DEVICE AND DATA PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAO, Yungang No.6 Kexueyuan South Road Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 02 /
MA, Jiuyue No.6 Kexueyuan South Road Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 03 /
SUI, Xiufeng No.6 Kexueyuan South Road Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 04 /
REN, Rui No.6 Kexueyuan South Road Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Lixin No.6 Kexueyuan South Road Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstrasse 8 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15785332.6 | 10.02.2015 | [2016/40] | WO2015CN72672 | Priority number, date | CN201410182148 | 30.04.2014 Original published format: CN201410182148 | CN201410682375 | 24.11.2014 Original published format: CN201410682375 | [2016/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015165298 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076296 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
G06F9/5027 (EP,RU,US);
G06F9/50 (EP,KR,RU,US);
G06F9/5011 (RU,US);
G06F9/4881 (RU,US);
G06F9/5044 (EP,US);
G06F9/546 (RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Title | German: | COMPUTER, STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/40] | English: | COMPUTER, CONTROL DEVICE AND DATA PROCESSING METHOD | [2016/40] | French: | ORDINATEUR, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES | [2016/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2016 | Translation filed | 28.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 29.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/24] | 01.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.01.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5787469 (MERRELL QUINN W [US]); | [I]WO02091180 (ORACLE CORP [US]); | [A]US2008209428 (BARYSHNIKOV BORIS [US], et al); | [I]US2009138682 (CAPPS JR LOUIS B [US], et al); | [A]US2012144253 (COMPARAN MIGUEL [US], et al) | International search | [A]CN102289385 ; | [X]CN102334103 (IBM) |