EP3137121 - DECONTAMINATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diversey, Inc. 1300 Altura Road Suite 125 Fort Mill, SC 29708 / US | [2020/18] |
Former [2017/10] | For all designated states Daylight Medical Inc. 17991 Englewood Drive Middleburg Heights, OH 44130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAYTON, Roderick, M. 17212 Misty Lake Drive Strongsville, OH 44136 / US | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 15785448.0 | 28.04.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015US27976 | Priority number, date | US201461985246P | 28.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461985246 P | US201461985234P | 28.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461985234 P | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015168111 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3137121 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 05.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B43K15/00, A61L2/10 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A61L2/10 (EP);
B43K15/00 (EP);
A61L2202/122 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/10] | A61L2/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Title | German: | DEKONTAMINATIONSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2017/10] | English: | DECONTAMINATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2017/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉCONTAMINATION | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 24.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5446289 (SHODEEN KEITH [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * sentences 42-52, paragraph 7 *; | [XI]US7507369 (LU MICHAEL YUAN [US]) [X] 1 * column 6, lines 26-37 - lines 50-55; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 2-5; | [A]US2010018240 (HECHT JOSEF [DE], et al) [A] 2* claim 1 *; | [I]KR20110132692 (MEDILUX CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-5 * claim 1 *; | [A]KR20120052521 (KIM JONG SEOK [KR]) [A] 5 * figure 6 *; | [A]US8193515 (KREITENBERG ARTHUR [US]) [A] 4 * column 6, line 40 - line 44 * | International search | [Y]CN103550801 (LIANG MEIQIN) [Y] 1-5 * , abstract, [0008], [0016]-[0018], fig.1 *; | [Y]US2014060094 (SHUR MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * , [0045]-[0048], fig.6b,7 *; | [Y]US2010018240 (HECHT JOSEF [DE], et al) [Y] 2 * , abstract, [0005], [0017], [0018] *; | [Y]RU16257U (OBCHESTVO S OGRANICHENNOI OTVETSVENNOSTIU ''MP ELECTRA'' et al.) [Y] 3 * , claims, fig.2 *; | [Y]US2012261593 (NOORI GILDA [US]) [Y] 4 * , [0018]-[0019] * | by applicant | CN103550801 |