EP3138156 - ANTENNA ARRAY FOR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parkervision, Inc. 7915 Baymeadows Way Suite 400 Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAWLINS, Gregory, S. 1577 Cherry Lake Way Heathrow, FL 32746 / US | 02 /
SORRELLS, David, F. 3129 Rideout Lane Middleburg, FL 32068 / US | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15785712.9 | 04.05.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015US29096 | Priority number, date | US201461987828P | 02.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461987828 P | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015168696 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3138156 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/26, H01Q21/06, // H01Q1/24, H01Q21/28 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
H01Q3/26 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/241 (EP,US);
H01Q21/06 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/10] | H01Q3/26, H01Q21/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Title | German: | GRUPPENANTENNE FÜR KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2017/10] | English: | ANTENNA ARRAY FOR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2017/10] | French: | ANTENNE RÉSEAU POUR SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 21.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/36] | 02.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US7394424 (JELINEK CARL O [US], et al) [Y] 6,10-14 * column 7, line 38 - column 13, line 3; figures 1, 2, 4, 5 *[A] 1-5,7-9,15; | [XY]US2013077708 (SORRELLS DAVID F [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,15 * page 3, paragraph 33 - page 3, paragraph 37 * * page 4, paragraph 49 - page 5, paragraph 58; figures 5, 6 * * page 5, paragraph 60 - page 6, paragraph 65; figure 7 * * page 6, paragraph 67 - page 6, paragraph 74; figures 8A, 8B * * page 7, paragraph 79 - page 7, paragraph 87; figure 10 * [Y] 6,10-14 | International search | [X]US2001038318 (JOHNSON MARTIN R [US], et al) [X] 1 * See paragraphs [0329], [0458]-[0465], [0680]-[0693], claim 36 and figures 25A-25H, 68A-99C. *; | [A]US2009111390 (SUTTON BRIAN P [US], et al) [A] 1 * See abstract, claims 1-5 and figures 1-10. *; | [A]US2010056083 (KIM JOON-HYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1* See abstract, claims 1-3 and figures 1-5. *; | [A]US2010093282 (MARTIKKALA RISTO [FI], et al) [A] 1 * See abstract, claims 1-5 and figures 1-8C. *; | [A]US2013028178 (COMEAU ADRIEN JOSEPH [CA]) [A] 1 * See abstract, claims 1-3 and figures 1-4. * |