EP3137811 - LED VENUE LIGHTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/10] | LED VENUE LIGHTING SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2021/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sportsbeams Lighting, Inc. 1201 E. 15th Street, Suite 404 Plano, TX 75074 / US | [2018/27] |
Former [2017/10] | For all designated states Bizwerks, LLC 1201 E. 15th Street Suite 404 Plano, TX 75074 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMES, Fred, H. 2701 Scenic Drive Piano, TX 75024 / US | 02 /
BAXTER, Kevin, C. 3830 Hillway Drive Glendale, CA 91208 / US | [2017/30] |
Former [2017/10] | 01 /
HOLMES, Fred, H. 4105 Bonita Plano, TX 75024 / US | ||
02 /
BAXTER, Kevin, C. 3830 Hillway Drive Glendale, CA 91208 / US | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 15785767.3 | 28.04.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015US28094 | Priority number, date | US201461985345P | 28.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461985345 P | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015168186 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3137811 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3137811 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/51, F21V29/67, F21V5/04, F21V31/00, // F21Y115/10, F21Y105/12, F21W131/105 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
F21V29/59 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/51 (KR,US);
F21V23/045 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/56 (KR,US);
F21V29/673 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/717 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/83 (US);
F21V31/00 (EP,KR,US);
F21V5/045 (EP,US);
F21V7/22 (KR,US);
F21V7/24 (EP,US);
F21V15/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/10] | F21V29/00, F21V29/67 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-VERANSTALTUNGSORTBELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/49] | English: | LED VENUE LIGHTING SYSTEM | [2021/49] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE DE TERRAIN PAR DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES | [2021/49] |
Former [2017/10] | LED-VERANSTALTUNGSORTBELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2017/10] | LED VENUE LIGHTING SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2017/10] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE DE TERRAIN PAR DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 28.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.06.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.05.2022 | AT | 11.05.2022 | CZ | 11.05.2022 | DK | 11.05.2022 | EE | 11.05.2022 | ES | 11.05.2022 | FI | 11.05.2022 | HR | 11.05.2022 | IT | 11.05.2022 | LT | 11.05.2022 | LV | 11.05.2022 | MC | 11.05.2022 | NL | 11.05.2022 | PL | 11.05.2022 | RO | 11.05.2022 | RS | 11.05.2022 | SE | 11.05.2022 | SI | 11.05.2022 | SK | 11.05.2022 | SM | 11.05.2022 | BG | 11.08.2022 | NO | 11.08.2022 | GR | 12.08.2022 | IS | 11.09.2022 | PT | 12.09.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005111234 (MARTIN PAUL S [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0029] * * figure 3 *; | [I]US2012092870 (TRALLI ALDO [NL], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0064] * * figures 2a,2b *; | [I]TWM448605U (HUI LIEN TRADING CO [TW]) [I] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [I]US2013223064 (LEE KE-CHIN [CN], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0043] * * figures 2,3 *; | [P]US2014119019 (HSU SHU-CHENG [TW]) [P] * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * | International search | [Y]US7244048 (POGGI BRIAN [GB]) [Y] 9 * ; figure 1, 6; column 5, lines 40-65 *; | [Y]US7600892 (BELLIVEAU RICHARD S [US], et al) [Y] 11 * ; figure 3; column 3, lines 10-15, 50-60 *; | [XY]US7629570 (MONDLOCH MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 17 * ; figure 2, 3A; column 2, lines 16-28; column 5. lines 13-40 * [Y] 18-20; | [Y]US2011043120 (PANAGOTACOS GEORGE W [US], et al) [Y] 15 * ; paragraph [0021] *; | [Y]WO2012099391 (LAYNIKS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 16* ; See Machine Translation; figure 6; page 5, paragraph 5-6 *; | [Y]CN102606945B (ZHONGSHAN CITY WEIQIANG TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-16, 18-20 * ; See Machine Translation; figures 2, 3; paragraph [0038, 0041, 0043, 0044] *; | [Y]US2014022780 (ROBERGE BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 14 * ; figure 3; paragraph [0049] *; | [Y]US8662702 (DATZ R MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 5 * ; figure 1, 3, 5; column 3, lines 15-40 *; | [Y]US8702255 (BAXTER KEVIN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-16, 20 * ; figure 7,15,17; column 13, lines 40-60; column 18, lines 4-8 * | Examination | US2010242519 | JP2011090854 | US2014043810 |