EP3137162 - MRI COMPATIBLE MEDICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nevro Corporation 1800 Bridge Parkway Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2017/27] |
Former [2017/10] | For all designated states Nevro Corporation 4040 Campbell Ave. Suite 210 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Vivek c/o Nevro Corporation 1800 Bridge Parkway Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 02 /
WALKER, Andre c/o Nevro Corporation 1800 Bridge Parkway Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 03 /
DIXIT, Apratim c/o Nevro Corporation 1800 Bridge Parkway Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2017/26] |
Former [2017/10] | 01 /
SHARMA, Vivek c/o Nevro Corporation 4040 Campbell Avenue Suite 210 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | ||
02 /
WALKER, Andre c/o Nevro Corporation 4040 Campbell Avenue Suite 210 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | |||
03 /
DIXIT, Apratim c/o Nevro Corporation 4040 Campbell Avenue Suite 210 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | Representative(s) | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15785919.0 | 01.05.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015US28928 | Priority number, date | US201461987891P | 02.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461987891 P | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015168645 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3137162 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 05.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/08 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
A61N1/0551 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (US);
A61N1/086 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/10] | A61N1/36, A61N1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Title | German: | MRI-KOMPATIBLE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2017/10] | English: | MRI COMPATIBLE MEDICAL DEVICES | [2017/10] | French: | DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX COMPATIBLES AVEC UN IRM | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 25.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Appeal following examination | 13.08.2020 | Appeal received No. J0025/20 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 23.08.2018 | Stay of proceedings | [2018/40] | 23.08.2018 | Stay of proceedings | [2022/42] | 01.12.2022 | Resumption of proceedings | [2022/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006200218 (WAHLSTRAND CARL D [US]) [Y] 11,15 * paragraphs [0066] , [ 0067]; figures 20, 22 *; | [XY]US2009099635 (FOSTER ARTHUR J [US]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * paragraphs [0030] , [ 0034] , [ 0041]; figure 5 * [Y] 4-7,11-15; | [Y]US2009270956 (VASE ABHI [US], et al) [Y] 4-7 * paragraphs [0027] , [ 0029]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2014058482 (GUPTA GAURAV [US], et al) [Y] 12-14* paragraphs [0072] , [ 0083]; figures 9, 13 * | International search | [Y]US2004243210 (MORGAN KEVIN L [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * , abstract, paragraphs [0023], [0048], fig. 6-8 *; | [Y]US2005222658 (HOEGH THOMAS B [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 5, 7 * , abstract, paragraphs [0061]-[0062], fig. 14, 20 *; | [Y]US2011071593 (PARKER JON [US], et al) [Y] 4-8 * , abstract, paragraphs [0027], fig. 1, 3-5 *; | [Y]US7174220 (CHITRE YOUGANDH [US], et al) [Y] 3 * , claim 12. fig. 10 * |