EP3073730 - BROADCAST SIGNAL TRANSMITTING APPARATUS, BROADCAST SIGNAL RECEIVING APPARATUS, METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING BROADCAST SIGNAL, AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING BROADCAST SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2016/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWAK, Minsung IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 02 /
YANG, Seungryul IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 03 /
MOON, Kyoungsoo IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 04 /
KO, Woosuk IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 05 /
HONG, Sungryong IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15785966.1 | 27.04.2015 | [2016/39] | WO2015KR04169 | Priority number, date | US201461984854P | 27.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461984854 P | US201461991624P | 12.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461991624 P | US201462000515P | 19.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462000515 P | US201462003039P | 27.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462003039 P | [2016/39] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015167186 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3073730 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/434, H04N21/462, H04N21/472 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
H04N21/258 (EP,US);
H04N21/2362 (KR,US);
H04N19/30 (KR);
H04N21/233 (US);
H04N21/234 (US);
H04N21/235 (US);
H04N21/2355 (KR);
H04N21/23892 (US);
H04N21/26283 (US);
H04N21/41 (EP,US);
H04N21/4335 (KR);
H04N21/4345 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/439 (US);
H04N21/44 (US);
H04N21/45 (EP,US);
H04N21/462 (EP,US);
H04N21/472 (US);
H04N21/47211 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/39] | H04N7/08, H04N7/01, H04N7/015 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN VON RUNDFUNKSIGNALEN, VORRICHTUNG ZUM EMPFANGEN VON RUNDFUNKSIGNALEN, VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN VON RUNDFUNKSIGNALEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANGEN VON RUNDFUNKSIGNALEN | [2016/39] | English: | BROADCAST SIGNAL TRANSMITTING APPARATUS, BROADCAST SIGNAL RECEIVING APPARATUS, METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING BROADCAST SIGNAL, AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING BROADCAST SIGNAL | [2016/39] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉMISSION DE SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION, APPAREIL DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION, PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉMETTRE UN SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR RECEVOIR UN SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION | [2016/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2016 | Translation filed | 22.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 06.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2720456 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0943]; figure 87 * | International search | [A]US2005080915 (SHOEMAKER CHARLES H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0106]-[0107], claims 1-10 and figures 3A-4. *; | [A]US2011289533 (WHITE GARETH DEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0094]-[0095] and figure 13. *; | [Y]US2011307925 (VAYSMAN ARTHUR [US], et al) [Y] 5-6, 11-12 * See paragraphs [0018], [0275] and figures 64-69. *; | [A]US2014020036 (HASEK CHARLES [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See abstract, claims 37-45 and figure 2A. *; | [XY]US2014047496 (KIM KYUNGHO [KR], et al) [X] 1-4, 7-10, 13-15 * See paragraphs [0082]-[0150], [0371]-[0389] and figures 4-5, 17. * [Y] 5-6, 11-12 |