EP3215725 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A SOOT LOAD ON A PARTICULATE FILTER PROVIDED WITH A SELECTIVELY CATALYTIC COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEPPELER, Berthold Teckstrasse 45/6 73277 Owen / DE | 02 /
WOOG, Thorsten Wildungerstrasse 40 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 15786870.4 | 28.10.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015EP02139 | Priority number, date | DE20141016347 | 05.11.2014 Original published format: DE102014016347 | [2017/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016070972 | Date: | 12.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3215725 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/035 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
F01N2550/04 (EP,US);
F01N2560/026 (EP,US);
F01N2560/06 (EP,US);
F01N2560/08 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1606 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERMITTELN EINER RUSSBELADUNG EINES MIT EINER SELEKTIV KATALYTISCHEN BESCHICHTUNG VERSEHENEN PARTIKELFILTERS | [2017/37] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A SOOT LOAD ON A PARTICULATE FILTER PROVIDED WITH A SELECTIVELY CATALYTIC COATING | [2017/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTÉRMINATION D'UNE CHARGE EN SUIES D'UN FILTRE À PARTICULES DOTÉ D'UN REVÊTEMENT CATALYTIQUE SÉLECTIF | [2017/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 02.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102006062515 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figure 1; claim 1 * * page 3, paragraphs 12,14,17 * * page 5, paragraph 33 * [I] 4,7,8,10; | [A]DE102012012016 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * * page 6, paragraphs 39,40 *; | [A]WO2006055992 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 2,3,5,6; claim 1 *; | [A]DE102007060623 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, paragraph 21 *; | [A]WO2008103109 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * page 13, line 32 - page 14, line 16 * | Examination | WO2014087536 |