Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10442505 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2019 | B2 | US2017327192 | 16.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP75185 | 29.10.2015 | GB201419394 | 31.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3212561 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2019 | B1 | EP3212561 | 06.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP75185 | 29.10.2015 | GB201419394 | 31.10.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016066776 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201419394 | 31.10.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201419394D0 | 17.12.2014 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201419394 | 31.10.2014 |