|
16.02.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2022 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
21.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2022 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2022 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.02.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
29.01.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
29.01.2016 |
International Search Report - copy in English for the IB |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |