Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3201139 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2023 | B1 | EP3201139 | 09.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015AT50245 | 30.09.2015 | AT506982014 | 01.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20230710T | 13.10.2023 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015AT50245 | 30.09.2015 | EP15787432 | 30.09.2015 | AT506982014 | 01.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3201139T | 30.10.2023 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015AT50245 | 30.09.2015 | EP15787432 | 30.09.2015 | AT506982014 | 01.10.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016049675 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT506982014 | 01.10.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT516359B | 15.06.2021 | B1 | AT516359 | 15.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT506982014 | 01.10.2014 |