EP3209670 - NEW THIENOPYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS NIK INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2018/23] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HYND, George 8/9 Spire Green CentreFlex Meadow Harlow Essex CM19 5TR / GB | 02 /
TISSELLI, Patrizia 8/9 Spire Green Centre Flex Meadow Harlow Essex CM19 5TR / GB | 03 /
MACLEOD, Calum 8/9Spire Green CentreFlex Meadow Harlow Essex CM19 5TR / GB | 04 /
MANN, Samuel Edward 8/9 Spire Green Centre Flex Meadow Harlow Essex CM19 5TR / GB | 05 /
MONTANA, John Gary 8/9 Spire Green CentreFlex Meadow Harlow Essex CM19 5TR / GB | 06 /
PRICE, Stephen Colin 8/9 Spire Green CentreFlex Meadow Harlow Essex CM19 5TR / GB | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Lenaerts, Philip Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2017/35] | Application number, filing date | 15787516.2 | 22.10.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015EP74430 | Priority number, date | EP20140190077 | 23.10.2014 Original published format: EP 14190077 | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016062789 | Date: | 28.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3209670 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3209670 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D519/00, A61K45/06, A61P35/00 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
C07D519/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07D495/04 (IL,KR);
A61K31/437 (IL,KR);
A61K31/519 (IL,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,US);
C07B2200/05 (CN,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Extension states | BA | 23.05.2017 | ME | 23.05.2017 | Validation states | MA | 23.05.2017 | Title | German: | NEUE THIENOPYRIMIDINDERIVATIVE ALS NIK INHIBITOREN | [2018/20] | English: | NEW THIENOPYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS NIK INHIBITORS | [2017/35] | French: | NOUVELLES DERIVÉS DE THIENOPYRIMIDINE COMME INHIBITEURS DE NIK | [2018/20] |
Former [2017/35] | NEUE THIENOPYRIMIDINDERIVATE ALS NIK-INHIBITOREN | ||
Former [2017/35] | NOUVEAUX DÉRIVÉS DE THIÉNOPYRIMIDINE UTILES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE NIK | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 08.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2015 | AL | 03.10.2018 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | LU | 22.10.2018 | MT | 22.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
MT | 22.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
MT | 22.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NO | 03.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2009158011 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-15* page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 4 *; | [AD]WO2012123522 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 18; example -; claim - * |