08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
28.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
01.11.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
29.10.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.07.2019 |
Change - inventor |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
10.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] |
29.12.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] |
13.12.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
28.07.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.07.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
05.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.04.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
21.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|