Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011130214 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2012 | A3 | WO2011130214 | 20.10.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32349710 | 13.04.2010 | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | US32349910 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083751 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011130210 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2012 | A3 | WO2011130210 | 20.10.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083780 | 11.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | US201113083776 | 11.04.2011 | US201113083765 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011130207 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2012 | A3 | WO2011130207 | 20.10.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | US90619210 | 18.10.2010 | US201113083759 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011130203 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2012 | A3 | WO2011130203 | 20.10.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083785 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011130198 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2012 | A3 | WO2011130198 | 20.10.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083860 | 11.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017303882 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201515515611 | 21.10.2015 | US201462067083 | 22.10.2014 | WO2015US56644 | 21.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9155509 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2015 | B2 | US2014341349 | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113083860 | 11.04.2011 | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | US201113284218 | 28.10.2011 | US201414447695 | 31.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8821017 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2014 | B2 | US2012039447 | 16.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113083860 | 11.04.2011 | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | US201113284218 | 28.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8876379 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2014 | B2 | US2011249807 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083785 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011249806 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | US90619210 | 18.10.2010 | US201113083759 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8672543 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2014 | B2 | US2011249805 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32349710 | 13.04.2010 | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | US32349910 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083751 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8568028 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2013 | B2 | US2011249804 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | US90619210 | 18.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8867705 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2014 | B2 | US2011249799 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | US201113083776 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8827554 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2014 | B2 | US2011249793 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083860 | 11.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8824634 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2014 | B2 | US2011249792 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083780 | 11.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8873712 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2014 | B2 | US2011249791 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | US201113083765 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10285656 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2019 | B2 | US2016174918 | 23.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113083860 | 11.04.2011 | US90619210 | 18.10.2010 | US201113284218 | 28.10.2011 | US201462093443 | 18.12.2014 | US201514974132 | 18.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10165992 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2019 | B2 | US2016181053 | 23.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113083860 | 11.04.2011 | US201462067083 | 22.10.2014 | US90619210 | 18.10.2010 | US201113284218 | 28.10.2011 | US201462093443 | 18.12.2014 | US201514974370 | 18.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130057991 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113083860 | 11.04.2011 | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32020 | 12.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130057977 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32030 | 12.04.2011 | US90619210 | 18.10.2010 | US201113083759 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101777436B | Global Dossier | 11.09.2017 | B1 | KR20130057996 | 03.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083780 | 11.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | WO2011US32035 | 12.04.2011 | US201113083776 | 11.04.2011 | US201113083765 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101770858B | Global Dossier | 23.08.2017 | B1 | KR20130057978 | 03.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32026 | 12.04.2011 | US201113083785 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6231148B | Global Dossier | 15.11.2017 | B2 | JP2016139619 | 04.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083780 | 11.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | US201113083776 | 11.04.2011 | US201113083765 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013524477 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083780 | 11.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | WO2011US32035 | 12.04.2011 | US201113083776 | 11.04.2011 | US201113083765 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5658352B | Global Dossier | 21.01.2015 | B2 | JP2013523400 | 17.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32349710 | 13.04.2010 | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | US32349910 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32041 | 12.04.2011 | US201113083751 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013523398 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32030 | 12.04.2011 | US90619210 | 18.10.2010 | US201113083759 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5833632B | Global Dossier | 16.12.2015 | B2 | JP2013523397 | 17.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32026 | 12.04.2011 | US201113083785 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013523396 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113083860 | 11.04.2011 | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32020 | 12.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2559325 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2018 | B1 | EP2559325 | 11.06.2014 | A4 | EP2559325 | 20.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083780 | 11.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | WO2011US32035 | 12.04.2011 | US201113083776 | 11.04.2011 | US201113083765 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2557997 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2015 | B1 | EP2557997 | 09.04.2014 | A4 | EP2557997 | 20.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113083860 | 11.04.2011 | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32020 | 12.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2557994 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2015 | B1 | EP2557994 | 02.04.2014 | A4 | EP2557994 | 20.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32349710 | 13.04.2010 | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | US32349910 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32041 | 12.04.2011 | US201113083751 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2557993 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2014 | A4 | EP2557993 | 20.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32030 | 12.04.2011 | US90619210 | 18.10.2010 | US201113083759 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2557992 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2017 | B1 | EP2557992 | 09.04.2014 | A4 | EP2557992 | 20.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32026 | 12.04.2011 | US201113083785 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106852114 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462067083 | 22.10.2014 | WO2015US56644 | 21.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105662446B | Global Dossier | 27.03.2020 | B | CN105662446 | 15.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083780 | 11.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | US201113083776 | 11.04.2011 | US201113083765 | 11.04.2011 | CN201180029009 | 12.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102934526 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | US201113083780 | 11.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | WO2011US32035 | 12.04.2011 | US201113083776 | 11.04.2011 | US201113083765 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102917646B | Global Dossier | 21.10.2015 | B | CN102917646 | 06.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113083860 | 11.04.2011 | US32347610 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32020 | 12.04.2011 | US201161449932 | 07.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102858246B | Global Dossier | 28.01.2015 | B | CN102858246 | 02.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32026 | 12.04.2011 | US201113083785 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102834054 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32030 | 12.04.2011 | US90619210 | 18.10.2010 | US201113083759 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102834053B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2015 | B | CN102834053 | 19.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US32349710 | 13.04.2010 | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | US32349910 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32041 | 12.04.2011 | US201113083751 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3209208 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2019 | B1 | EP3209208 | 30.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462067083 | 22.10.2014 | WO2015US56644 | 21.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2547144T | 02.10.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US32349710 | 13.04.2010 | US32350310 | 13.04.2010 | US32349910 | 13.04.2010 | WO2011US32041 | 12.04.2011 | US201161083751 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016064993 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462067083 | 22.10.2014 |