EP3139892 - MIXABLE MULTI-FUNCTIONAL PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR KERATIN FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELC Management LLC 155 Pinelawn Road, Suite 345 South Melville, NY 11747 / US | [2020/03] |
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states ELC Management LLC 155 Pinelawn Road, Suite 345 South Melville, NY 11747 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPNIEWSKI, George 26 Glendale Drive Melville, New York 11747 / US | 02 /
MAROTTA, Paul 145 Intervale Avenue Farmingdale, New York 11735 / US | 03 /
FRAMPTON, Katie Ann 72 Edel Avenue West Babylon, New York 11704 / US | 04 /
SANTA MARIA, Christina 151 East 71st Street Apt. 2 New York, New York 10021 / US | 05 /
PACKARD, Nicole 22 Healy Street Huntington, New York 11743 / US | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/03] |
Former [2017/11] | Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15788853.8 | 22.04.2015 | [2017/11] | WO2015US26990 | Priority number, date | US201414271556 | 07.05.2014 Original published format: US201414271556 | [2017/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015171309 | Date: | 12.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3139892 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3139892 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q1/10, A61Q5/06, A61K8/06, A61K8/26, A61K8/31, A61K8/49, A61Q5/00, A61K8/81, A61K8/92, A45D40/26, A45D7/04, A61K8/891, A45D7/00 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
A61K8/891 (EP,KR,US);
A45D7/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61K8/064 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/31 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/4973 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/8111 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/92 (EP,US);
A61Q1/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/065 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/11] | A61K8/06, A61K8/19, A61K8/65 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHBARES MULTIFUNKTIONALES PRODUKT UND VERFAHREN FÜR KERATINFASERN | [2017/11] | English: | MIXABLE MULTI-FUNCTIONAL PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR KERATIN FIBERS | [2017/11] | French: | PRODUIT MULTIFONCTIONNEL POUVANT ÊTRE MÉLANGÉ, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FIBRES DE KÉRATINE | [2017/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 02.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2015 | AL | 15.01.2020 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | FI | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | NL | 15.01.2020 | PL | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | RS | 15.01.2020 | SE | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | SM | 15.01.2020 | TR | 15.01.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | IE | 22.04.2020 | LU | 22.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 22.04.2015 | |
AL | 15.01.2020 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IE | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 22.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.04.2015 | |
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IE | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 22.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IE | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 22.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
LU | 22.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
LU | 22.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 15.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1591975 (MONTIEL A) [X] 1,2,4,6-15 * claims 1,9 * * page 1, lines 29-39 * * page 1, line 98 - page 2, line 10 * * page 2, lines 11-39 * * page 2, lines 59-63 * * figure - * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]US2005061349 (PATEL LILAVATI [US], et al) [X] 1 * claim - * * example - * [Y] 1-15; | [XYI]WO2008074870 (OREAL [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8-13,15 * claim - * * page 2 * * page 91, lines 17-21 * * examples 1,2 * [Y] 14 [I] 3,5; | [XI]US2012298128 (HODGETTS JENNIFER CLARE [GB], et al) [X] 1 * claim - * * paragraph [0002] * * page 3, paragraph 32 - page 7, paragraph 65 * * examples 1,2; table - * * figure - * [I] 1-15; | [T]US2013308823 (SMITH CHARLES ROBERT [GB], et al) [T] 4,8,12,13 * claim - ** example - *; | [XI]WO2014001391 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1 * claim - * * examples 1,2 * [I] 1-15; | [YP]WO2014149869 (ELC MAN LLC [US]) [YP] 1-15 * claim 12 * * page 2, lines 4-6 * * examples 1,2 *; | [IY] - Markwins, "Double Action Mascara", GNPD, MINTEL, (20060701), Database accession no. 555806, XP002775434 [I] 1-15 * product description; ingredients * [Y] 1-15 | International search | [A]US6967024 (SCANCARELLA NEIL D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract; claim 1. *; | [Y]US2007014744 (SWISTOWSKI AZRA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See abstract; paragraph [0043]; claims 1, 6 and 9. *; | [Y]US2011044924 (VERBOOM GILLES [US], et al) [Y] 5-20 * See abstract; claims 32 and 45-46. *; | [A]US2012298128 (HODGETTS JENNIFER CLARE [GB], et al) [A] 1-20* See abstract; claims 1 and 19. *; | [Y]US2013045254 (TING-JENULIS ARLENE G [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See abstract; paragraphs [0030], [0053] and [0055]-[0056]; claims 1, 4 and 15. * |