EP3229112 - METAL GRID, TOUCH SCREEN, DISPLAY APPARATUS AND TOUCH SCREEN MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Hefei Xinsheng Optoelectronics Technology Co. Ltd Xinzhan Industrial Park Hefei, Anhui 230012 / CN | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Xiaodong No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
HU, Ming No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
TU, Zhizhong No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Ming No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Qingpu No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 06 /
LI, Kefeng No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | Gesthuysen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 15790434.3 | 30.04.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015CN77945 | Priority number, date | CN201410735309 | 04.12.2014 Original published format: CN201410735309 | [2017/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016086583 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3229112 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
G06F3/0443 (EP,US);
G06F3/0412 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/044 (CN);
G06F3/0446 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04103 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04111 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04112 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | METALLGITTER, BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/41] | English: | METAL GRID, TOUCH SCREEN, DISPLAY APPARATUS AND TOUCH SCREEN MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2017/41] | French: | GRILLE MÉTALLIQUE, ÉCRAN TACTILE, APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉCRAN TACTILE | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2015 | Translation filed | 16.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2015 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 16.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/39] | 23.08.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2021 | 19.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014185388 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005]; figures 11,12 * [I] 5-7,9-13,15; | US2016092004 [ ] (YOSHIKI TAKENOBU [JP]); | [XI]EP2725463 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0076] * [I] 4-7,10,12; | [XI]US2011018838 (LEE CHIH YEN [TW]) [X] 1-4,8,9,11-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0031] * [I] 5-7,10,15; | [XI]EP2662758 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,7-9,11,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0092] * [I] 4-6,10,12,13,15 | International search | [X]CN103777810 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD) [X] 1, 10, 17 * , claim 1 *; | [A]CN104123037 (YECHENG PHOTOELECTRIC SENZHEN CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN104375710 (HEFEI XINSHENG OPTOELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-18* the whole document * |