EP3224452 - DEVICE FOR SAMPLING A PRESSURISED FLUID, EQUIPPED WITH MEANS FOR INCREASING THE VOLUME OF THE SAMPLING CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flodim, SARL Technoparc des Grandes Terres 110, rue des Rizieres 04100 Manosque / FR | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRABEIL, Jean-Paul Impasse Saint-Joseph 04100 Manosque / FR | 02 /
WALRAVE, Thierry c/o Flodim Technoparc des Grandes Terres 110, rue des Riziéres 04100 Manosque / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | 01 /
CRABEIL, Jean-Paul Impasse Saint-Joseph F-04100 Manosque / FR | ||
02 /
WALRAVE, Thierry c/o FLODIM Technoparc des Grandes Terres 110, rue des Riziéres 04100 MANOSQUE / FR | |||
Former [2017/40] | 01 /
CRABEIL, Jean-Paul Impasse Saint-Joseph F-04100 Manosque / FR | ||
02 /
WALRAVE, Thierry 438 Chemin René Char Quartier Saint Vincent F-84400 Apt / FR | Representative(s) | Fédit-Loriot 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Louiset, Raphaël Louis Petit 174 Rue de Vaugirard 75015 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15790557.1 | 05.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015EP75815 | Priority number, date | FR20140002654 | 25.11.2014 Original published format: FR 1402654 | [2017/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016083092 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224452 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E21B49/08, G01N1/20 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
E21B49/081 (EP,US);
E21B47/06 (US);
E21B47/07 (US);
E21B49/086 (US);
G01N1/2035 (EP,US);
G01N2001/105 (EP,US);
G01N2001/2057 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR PROBENAHME EINES UNTER DRUCK STEHENDEN FLUIDS, AUSGESTATTET MIT MITTELN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES VOLUMENS DER PROBENAHMEKAMMER | [2017/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR SAMPLING A PRESSURISED FLUID, EQUIPPED WITH MEANS FOR INCREASING THE VOLUME OF THE SAMPLING CHAMBER | [2017/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRELEVEMENT D'UN FLUIDE SOUS PRESSION EQUIPE DE MOYENS POUR AUGMENTER LE VOLUME DE LA CHAMBRE D'ECHANTILLONNAGE | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 22.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/45] | 01.10.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2021 | 15.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5901788 (BROWN JONATHAN WEBSTER [GB], et al) [A] 14 * column 1, lines 4-5 ** column 2, lines 11-15 *; | [XI]US6334489 (SHWE THAN [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 12 * * column 4, lines 44-65 * [I] 5,9-13; | [XI]US7258167 (SHAMMAI MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,14-16,19 * figures 1-7 * * column 1, lines 19-25 * * column 5 - column 7 * [I] 5,9-13,17,18; | [XI]US2009187346 (LI BAOYAN [US]) [X] 1,2,8,14,16-19 * figures 13-14 * * paragraphs [0073] - [0074] - [0 77] * [I] 5,9-13 | Examination | US5901788 | US6334489 | US2002060067 | WO2006044567 | US2009187346 | RU2470152 | FR2999224 | by applicant | US5896926 | US5945611 | WO2014087061 | FR2999224 |