08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
20.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
04.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
10.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
12.03.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
03.04.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
31.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.03.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.12.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
01.12.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
10.11.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
05.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.04.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
25.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|