01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
08.11.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
22.02.2019 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
18.01.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
30.11.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
23.11.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.11.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.11.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
15.07.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.06.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
01.06.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
11.05.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
29.12.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] |
29.12.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] |
20.11.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2017 |
Change - inventor |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
28.07.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
28.07.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.07.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
05.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
11.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|