EP3221326 - CONCENTRATED LOW-VISCOSITY RHAMNOLIPID COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2019/50] |
Former [2019/09] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2017/39] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHILLING, Martin Lipschitzstrasse 40 53121 Bonn / DE | 02 /
KLEINEN, Jochen Edith Steinstrasse 3 52525 Heinsberg / DE | 03 /
LORENZ, Josef Wieselpfad 17 47809 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
WENK, Hans Henning Westminsterstrasse 47 45470 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 15791601.6 | 09.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015EP76019 | Priority number, date | EP20140193779 | 19.11.2014 Original published format: EP 14193779 | [2017/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016078947 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3221326 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3221326 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07H13/06, C11D1/83 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
C11D1/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07H13/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K8/60 (CN,KR,US);
A61Q19/10 (CN,KR,US);
A61Q5/02 (CN,KR,US);
C07H1/06 (CN,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONZENTRIERTE, NIEDRIGVISKOSE RHAMNOLIPID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2017/39] | English: | CONCENTRATED LOW-VISCOSITY RHAMNOLIPID COMPOSITIONS | [2017/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE RHAMNOLIPIDE CONCENTRÉES ET DE FAIBLE VISCOSITÉ | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 25.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2019/34] | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102012221519 (EVONIK INDUSTRIES AG [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0011] , [0012] , [0015] * * examples 1-3 ** claims 1,2,3,7 *; | [A] - YUTAKA ISHIGAMI ET AL, "Colloid chemical effect of polar head moieties of a rhamnolipid-type biosurfactant", LANGMUIR, (19930701), vol. 9, no. 7, doi:10.1021/la00031a006, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 1634 - 1636, XP055190601 [A] 1-14 * page 1634 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la00031a006 | Examination | JPS6377535 | WO2006096912 | TW201009080 | - GAMA, YASUO ET AL, "Preparation of rhamnolipid pyrene acyl esters as fluorescent probes", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1990), Database accession no. 1990:198973, URL: STN, XP002792579 | by applicant | DE4237334 | WO2012013554 | US2013130319 | DE102012221519 | US2014296168 | - ABDEL-MAWGOUD ET AL., APPL BIOCHEM BIOTECHNOL., (200905), vol. 157, no. 2, pages 329 - 45 |