EP3227987 - LINEAR ELECTRICAL ACTUATING SYSTEM WITH ENERGY STORAGE MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/41] | ELECTRIC LINEAR ACTUATION SYSTEM EQUIPPED WITH ENERGY-STORAGE MEANS | ||
[2020/10] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2017/44] |
Former [2017/41] | For all designated states IFP Énergies nouvelles 1 & 4, Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODRU, Pierre 0187 Rue Lenain de Tillemont F-93100 Montreuil / FR | 02 /
CONSTANT, Michel 0006 Rue Le Laboureur F-95160 Montmorency / FR | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize BP3 69360 Solaize / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 15791647.9 | 10.11.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015EP76239 | Priority number, date | FR20140061844 | 03.12.2014 Original published format: FR 1461844 | [2017/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016087171 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3227987 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/06, H02K7/02, H02K16/00, E21B19/00, E21B19/09, B63B35/44, H02J3/32, H02J7/34, B66C13/02, F16H23/00 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
B63B35/4413 (EP,US);
E21B19/006 (US);
B66C13/02 (EP,US);
E21B19/09 (EP,US);
F16H23/00 (EP,US);
H02J7/0068 (US);
H02K7/02 (EP,US);
H02K7/025 (US);
H02K7/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/41] | H02K7/06, H02K7/02, E21B19/00, E21B19/09, B63B35/44, H02J3/32, H02J7/34, H02K16/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH LINEAR ANTRIEBSSYSTEM MIT ENERGIESPEICHERFUNKTION | [2020/10] | English: | LINEAR ELECTRICAL ACTUATING SYSTEM WITH ENERGY STORAGE MEANS | [2020/10] | French: | SYSTEME D'ACTIONNEMENT LINEAIRE ELECTRIQUE EQUIPE DE MOYENS DE STOCKAGE D'ENERGIE | [2017/41] |
Former [2017/41] | ELEKTRISCHES LINEARES BETÄTIGUNGSSYSTEM MIT ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2017/41] | ELECTRIC LINEAR ACTUATION SYSTEM EQUIPPED WITH ENERGY-STORAGE MEANS | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 04.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/52] | 07.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]FR2218273 (DORIS DEV RICHESSE SOUS MARINE [FR]) [I] 1 * abstract * * page 16, line 35 - page 17, line 12 * [Y] 11-14; | [Y]FR2575452 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [XYI]EP0363158 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 4, line 11 - column 4, line 51 * * column 8, line 1 - column 10, line 18 * [Y] 4,5,11-14 [I] 6-10; | [A]JP2001163574 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1* abstract *; | [IY]WO2008102166 (NAT OILWELL VARCO LP [US], et al) [I] 1 * abstract * * page 4, line 33 - page 7, line 25 * * page 10, line 20 - page 14, line 7 * [Y] 4,5; | [A]WO2009156953 (BREA IMPIANTI S U R L [IT], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US2010314168 (WILLIAMS KEVIN R [US]) [Y] 1,4,5 * abstract *; | [X]EP2385608 (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [IY]EP2445080 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0046] * [Y] 4,5; | [X]WO2014094778 (WAVE STAR AS [DK]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2575452 | US5520369 | EP1927543 | EP2232101 |